Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 0.924 Acre, More or Less, in Nelson Co., VA, Located on Parcel ID No. 46-5-4A, Identified on That Certain Subdivision Plat Recorded in Plat Cabinet 4, Slide 40A Among the Land Records of Nelson Co., et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: 0.924 Acre, More or Less, in Nelson Co., VA, Located on Parcel ID No. 46-5-4A, Identified on That Certain Subdivision Plat Recorded in Plat Cabinet 4, Slide 40A Among the Land Records of Nelson Co.,, Amy Bowman Leake and Alton Scott Leake
Case Number: 3:2018cv00114
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER hereby ADOPTS the Rule 26(f)Agreed Written Plan #7 filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC, including the parties' stipulation pursuant to Rule 502 of the Federal Rule of Evidence. Furthermore, certain deadlines in the Pretrial Order #5 are MODIFIED and all other terms remain unchanged and in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 1/24/19. (jcj)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Plaintiff Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC (Lee, Nathaniel)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) Jury Trial set for March 2-4, 2021 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER, CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 1/3/2019. (hnw)
December 28, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Alton Scott Leake, Amy Bowman Leake.(Perdue, Benjamin)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Southern Co. for Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (hnw)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC of #1 Complaint in Condemnation (hnw)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 0.924 Acre, More or Less, in Nelson Co., VA, Located on Parcel ID No. 46-5-4A, Identified on That Certain Subdivision Plat Recorded in Plat Cabinet 4, Slide 40A Among the Land Records of Nelson Co.,, Alton Scott Leake, Amy Bowman Leake (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400. paid by e-receipt #0423-3026823), filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-A Property Depiction, #2 Exhibit 1-B Property Depiction, #3 Exhibit 2 FERC Certificate, #4 Exhibit 3 ACP Route, #5 Exhibit 4A Plat, #6 Exhibit 4B Plat, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 0.924 Acre, More or Less, in Nelson Co., VA, Located on Parcel ID No. 46-5-4A, Identified on That Certain Subdivision Plat Recorded in Plat Cabinet 4, Slide 40A Among the Land Records of Nelson Co., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Kang He
Represented By: John David Wilburn
Represented By: Richard Dean Holzheimer
Represented By: Nathaniel Patrick Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.924 Acre, More or Less, in Nelson Co., VA, Located on Parcel ID No. 46-5-4A, Identified on That Certain Subdivision Plat Recorded in Plat Cabinet 4, Slide 40A Among the Land Records of Nelson Co.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Bowman Leake
Represented By: Benjamin Leland Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alton Scott Leake
Represented By: Benjamin Leland Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?