Dandridge v. Scott et al
Appellee: Virginia National Bank and W. Stephen Scott
Appellant: Victor M. Dandridge, III
Case Number: 3:2019cv00002
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Bankruptcy Briefing Notice: Appellant Brief due by 3/15/2019. Appellee Brief due by 4/15/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 4/29/2019. (jcj)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 Designation of Record on Appeal; Bankruptcy Court case number 17-60578. (Campbell, Pamela)
February 6, 2019 Filing 3 Supplemental Bankruptcy Notice to show filing fee paid. (jcj)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 DEBTOR'S OUT OF TIME MOTION for Extension of Time to pay filing fee by Victor M. Dandridge, III. (jcj)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court filed 1/11/2019; Bankruptcy Court case number 17-60578; Adversary Number N.A. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing Appeal, #2 Notice of Deficiency, #3 Notice of Appeal and Statement of Election, #4 Order being appealed, #5 Motion to become party to mediation between Chapter 7 Trustee and Virginia National Bank, #6 Lettere from Victor M. Dandridge, III, #7 B/K Docket Sheet)(jcj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dandridge v. Scott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Virginia National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: W. Stephen Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Victor M. Dandridge, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?