CFA Institute v. American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries et al

Plaintiff: CFA Institute
Defendant: American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries
Case Number: 3:2019cv00012
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/12/2019 re #16 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, in View of Pending Administrative Proceeding Before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board and Memorandum in Support filed by American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries. (FTR Operator: H. Wheeler) (hnw)
April 12, 2019 Filing 28 FTR Log Notes for Telephonic Motion Hearing in the Charlottesville Division in CR3 held before Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/12/19. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player, and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. FTR Operator: H. Wheeler (hnw)
April 10, 2019 Filing 27 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Gill, Anthony)
April 8, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, in View of Pending Administrative Proceeding Before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board and Memorandum in Support . filed by American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries(a Texas Corporation ). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rash, Charles)
April 4, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, in View of Pending Administrative Proceeding Before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board and Memorandum in Support, #18 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 Pretrial Order, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge - Joint Motion To Amend Pretrial Order : (FTR) Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to set up call and email parties dial in information.(kld)
April 1, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CFA Institute re #23 Response in Opposition to Motion (Gill, Anthony)
April 1, 2019 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, in View of Pending Administrative Proceeding Before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board and Memorandum in Support . filed by CFA Institute. (Gill, Anthony)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Oral ORDER granting #20 MOTION for Mark S. Sommers to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/1/19. (JCH)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Oral ORDER granting #19 MOTION for Naresh Kilaru to Appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 4/1/19. (JCH)
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Mark Sommers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3110180. by American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries(a Texas Corporation ). Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rash, Charles)
March 29, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Naresh Kilaru to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3109646. by American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries(a Texas Corporation ). Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rash, Charles)
March 28, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 Pretrial Order, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge - Joint Motion To Amend Pretrial Order by CFA Institute. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Gill, Anthony)
March 18, 2019 Filing 17 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries(a Texas Corporation ) (Rash, Charles)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, in View of Pending Administrative Proceeding Before the Trademark Trial and Appeal Board and Memorandum in Support by American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries(a Texas Corporation ). Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rash, Charles)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/18/19. (jcj)
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Brandon Rash on behalf of All Defendants (Rash, Charles)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORAL ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Ann K. Ford for CFA Institute added; granting #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney John M. Nading for CFA Institute added. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/1/19. (hnw)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CFA Institute. (Gill, Anthony)
February 26, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CFA Institute. (Gill, Anthony)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CFA Institute. American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries(a Texas Corporation ) served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019.(Gill, Anthony)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by the Clerk with Additional/Continuation page and exhibits (Attachments: #1 Continuation Page, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(hnw)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for John M. Nading to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3082047. by CFA Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of John M. Nading, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gill, Anthony)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Ann K. Ford to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3082032. by CFA Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration Ann K. Ford, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gill, Anthony)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by CFA Institute re #1 - Report On The Filing Or Determination Of An Action Regarding A Patent Or Trademark - (Gill, Anthony)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by CFA Institute (Gill, Anthony)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries(a Texas Corporation ) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
February 22, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries(a Texas Corporation ) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries(a Texas Corporation ) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries(a Texas Corporation ) (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt 0423-308700.), filed by CFA Institute. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CFA Institute v. American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Society of Pension Professionals & Actuaries
Represented By: Naresh Kilaru
Represented By: Charles Brandon Rash
Represented By: Mark S. Sommers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CFA Institute
Represented By: Anthony David Gill
Represented By: John McClung Nading
Represented By: Ann Katherine Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?