Doe v. The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia et al
Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: L. D. Britt, Babur B. Lateef, James V. Reyes, Maurice A. Jones, Jeffrey C. Walker, John Flood, Barbara J. Fried, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, Robert D. Hardie, John A. Griffin, Mark T. Bowles, Tammy S. Murphy, C. Evans Poston, Jr., Whittington W. Clement, James B. Murray, Jr., Elizabeth M. Cranwell, James E. Ryan, Robert M. Blue, Thomas A. DePasquale, Emily Babb and Frank M. Connor, III
Case Number: 3:2019cv00038
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad: Motion Hearing held on 8/21/2019 re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Doe. (Court Reporter: JoRita Meyer) (ssm)
August 12, 2019 Filing 49 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by John Doe. (Quagliana, Rhonda)
August 8, 2019 Filing 48 ORAL ORDER regarding Briefing Order #14 : extending the reply deadline for plaintiff from 08/09/19 to 08/14/19, by agreement of the parties. At the direction of Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 08/08/2019. (ssm)
August 2, 2019 Filing 47 Supplemental Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by Emily Babb, Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Connor, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John Flood, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Babur B. Lateef, Tammy S. Murphy, James B. Murray, Jr, C. Evans Poston, Jr, James V. Reyes, James E. Ryan, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, Jeffrey C. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support by Emily Babb, #2 Declaration in Support by John Flood, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Meek, Barry)
July 19, 2019 Filing 46 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Quagliana, Rhonda)
July 19, 2019 Filing 45 STIPULATION of Undisputed Facts by John Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Quagliana, Rhonda)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting unopposed #2 Motion to Proceed under a Pseudonym and for a Protective Order. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 07/12/2019. (ssm)
July 12, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Wolf Riley on behalf of All Defendants (Riley, Melissa)
July 12, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine Hyejung Yoon on behalf of All Defendants (Yoon, Jasmine)
July 12, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry Todd Meek on behalf of All Defendants (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 40 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by John Flood (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 39 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Emily Babb (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 38 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by James E. Ryan (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 37 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jeffrey C. Walker (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 36 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by James V. Reyes (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 35 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by C. Evans Poston, Jr (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 34 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tammy S. Murphy (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 33 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Babur B. Lateef (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 32 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maurice A. Jones (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 31 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert D. Hardie (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 30 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by John A. Griffin (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 29 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Barbara J. Fried (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 28 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thomas A. DePasquale (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 27 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elizabeth M. Cranwell (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 26 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whittington W. Clement (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 25 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by L. D. Britt (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 24 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mark T. Bowles (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 23 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Robert M. Blue (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 22 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by James B. Murray, Jr (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 21 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Frank M. Connor, III (Meek, Barry)
July 11, 2019 Filing 20 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia (Meek, Barry)
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Filing Requirement to The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jcj)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Motions (Telephonic) held on 6/27/2019 before Judge Conrad. Court Reporter/Transcriber JoRita Meyer, Telephone number 540-857-5100, ext. 5311, JoRitaM@vawd.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vawd.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER unless a Redacted Transcript has been filed. Redaction Request due 7/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/8/2019. (jm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine Hyejung Yoon on behalf of The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia (Yoon, Jasmine)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 Financial arrangements made (Original) (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) re #13 Transcript Request, Transcript due by 7/15/2019. (jm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #2 MOTION and Memorandum for Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym and for a Protective Order re #1 Complaint,, : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2019 01:30 PM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. (ssm)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Briefing Order regarding MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction #3 filed by John Doe. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 07/03/2019. (ssm)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST (Expedited-7 calendar days Service) by John Doe for Teleconference re: Motion for TRO/PI held on 06/27/19 reported by Court Reporter JoRita Meyer before Judge Hon. Glen Conrad. Transcript Due Deadline will be set when Financial Arrangements are made. (Quagliana, Rhonda)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING IN PART the #3 Motion for TRO and for Preliminary Injunction; ENJOINING the defendants from proceeding with the Review Panel Hearing scheduled for Monday, July 1, 2019; and STAYING the conduct of the Review Panel Hearing pending further order of the court. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 06/28/2019. (ssm)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 06/28/2019. (ssm)
June 27, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad: Motion Hearing held on 6/27/2019 re #2 MOTION and Memorandum for Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym and for a Protective Order re #1 Complaint, filed by John Doe. (Court Reporter: JoRita Meyer) (ssm)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Seal Document #6 Attachment FIR to Defendant University of Virginia's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 06/26/2019. (ssm)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by John Doe. (Quagliana, Rhonda)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit by John Doe. (Quagliana, Rhonda)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #4 Brief / Memorandum in Support, #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FIR - Redacted)(Meek, Barry)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Doe. All Defendants.(Quagliana, Rhonda)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . filed by John Doe. (Quagliana, Rhonda)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Text of Proposed Order)(Quagliana, Rhonda) (Attachment 8 replaced on 6/26/2019) (hnw). (Attachment 7 replaced on 6/27/2019) (hnw). Attachments 8 and 7 were modified to replace deficient/incorrect pdf documents with corrected pdf documents
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION and Memorandum for Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym and for a Protective Order re #1 Complaint,, by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quagliana, Rhonda)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Emily Babb, Robert M. Blue, Mark T. Bowles, L. D. Britt, Whittington W. Clement, Frank M. Connor, III, Elizabeth M. Cranwell, Thomas A. DePasquale, John Flood, Barbara J. Fried, John A. Griffin, Robert D. Hardie, Maurice A. Jones, Babur B. Lateef, Tammy S. Murphy, James B. Murray, Jr, C. Evans Poston, Jr, James V. Reyes, James E. Ryan, The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia, Jeffrey C. Walker (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt #0423-3170772.), filed by John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. D. Britt
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babur B. Lateef
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James V. Reyes
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maurice A. Jones
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey C. Walker
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Flood
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara J. Fried
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Rector and Visitors of the University of Virginia
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Hardie
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Griffin
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Bowles
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy S. Murphy
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Evans Poston, Jr.
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittington W. Clement
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B. Murray, Jr.
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth M. Cranwell
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Ryan
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Blue
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. DePasquale
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Babb
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank M. Connor, III
Represented By: Barry Todd Meek
Represented By: Melissa Wolf Riley
Represented By: Jasmine Hyejung Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Rhonda Quagliana
Represented By: Francesca Evans Fornari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?