McCoy v. University of Virginia Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Tina M. McCoy
Defendant: Ryan M. Rall, University of Virginia Medical Center, Commonwealth of Virginia, Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia and Charles Wilson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00050
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Status Conference Call set for 3/12/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email counsel dial in information.(kld)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER regarding State Court Records - Paper, #14 it is hereby ordered that Defendant Commonwealth of Virginia may file a motion to dismiss under Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and it may raise only those arguments previously asserted in the demurrer. The briefing schedule for the motion to dismiss is as follows: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss November 15, 2019; Plaintiff's Response December 4, 2019; Defendant's Reply December 11, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/31/19. (hnw)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Scheduling Conference Call held in chambers on 10/31/2019. (kld)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Scheduling Conference Call set for 10/31/2019 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email parties dial in information.(kld)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 Paper State Court Records received from Circuit Court of Albemarle County, CL18-1215, consisting of Part 3 service, objections, interrogatories, Part 2 Notices/Demurrers Answers and Ameded Complaint,, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3Original Answers and Complaint)(hnw)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia of Completion of Briefing (Ebanks, Elizabeth)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Adopting the Rule 26(f)Joint Discovery Plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/9/19. (hnw)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Ebanks, Elizabeth)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for September 1-4, 2020 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Tina M. McCoy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brown, Carla)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendant Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia (Ebanks, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL ORDER, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/16/19. (hnw)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Albemarle County Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/16/19. (hnw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Ebanks, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ebanks, Elizabeth)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint Complaint by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia.(Ebanks, Elizabeth)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albemarle County Circuit Court, case number CL18-1215. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt no. 0423-3220709), filed by Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Consent Order, #2 Exhibit B- Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D-Notice of Filing, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. University of Virginia Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan M. Rall
Represented By: Edwin Lewis Kincer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Virginia Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Virginia
Represented By: Edwin Lewis Kincer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rector and Board of Visitors of the University of Virginia
Represented By: Bret Gregory Daniel
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Ebanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Wilson
Represented By: Edwin Lewis Kincer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina M. McCoy
Represented By: Carla Denette Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?