Basham v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth T. Basham
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart and Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00052
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 16 Paper State Court Records received from Louisa County Circuit Court, CL19-269, consisting of Complaint, Interrogatories, Copies of Service, Answer (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (jcj)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Moore, Joseph)
October 30, 2019 Filing 14 Rule 26(a)(3) Pretrial Disclosures by Plaintiff Elizabeth T. Basham (Craig, Graven)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Status Conference Call set for 1/3/2020 10:30 AM in Charlottesville before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email counsel dial in information.(kld)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Scheduling Conference Call held in chambers on 10/29/2019. (kld)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (FTR) Scheduling Conference Call set for 10/29/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (kld)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER adopting the parties' Rule 26(f) Report and modifying certain deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/11/19. (hnw)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Moore, Joseph)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 5/13/2020 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/30/19. (jcj)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AGREED ORDER Dismissing without prejudice the parties Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart and Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. and removing same from any further pleadings in this matter. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/27/19. (hnw)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Louisa Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/13/19. (jcj)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart, Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Moore, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart, Inc. (Moore, Joseph)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Wal-Mart, Inc. (jcj)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Louisa Circuit Court, case number CL 19000290-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt 0423-3224192), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Motion to Transfer, #4 Exhibit C - Answer filed in State Court)(jcj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basham v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Joseph Michael Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth T. Basham
Represented By: Graven Winslow Craig
Represented By: Rae Tilton Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?