Carpenter Co. v. MlilyUSA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carpenter Co.
Defendant: MlilyUSA, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00055
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Shoshana Rogovsky for MlilyUSA, Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/15/19. (jcj)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Abigail Rubenstein for MlilyUSA, Inc. added. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/15/19. (jcj)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Joel Weiss. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/15/19. (jcj)
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Shoshana Rogovsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3271818. by MlilyUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shepard, Georgina)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Abigail Rubinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3271809. by MlilyUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shepard, Georgina)
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Joel Weiss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3271796. by MlilyUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shepard, Georgina)
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for 7/13-7/16/2020 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ssm)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions Deadline due by 6/3/2020 Jury Trial set for 7/13-16/2020 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/14/2019. (ssm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 Scheduling Letter (ssm)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint #1 with JURY DEMAND by MlilyUSA, Inc..(Shepard, Georgina)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer MlilyUSA, Inc. answer due 10/30/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 10/23/2019. (ssm)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jcj)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MlilyUSA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shepard, Georgina)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Georgina Clare Shepard on behalf of MlilyUSA, Inc. (Shepard, Georgina)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service of Complaint and Summons on October 2, 2019 upon MlilyUSA, Inc.(Lance, Holly)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to MlilyUSA, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by the Clerk (jcj)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carpenter Co. (jcj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MlilyUSA, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt 0423-3230936.), filed by Carpenter Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(jcj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter Co. v. MlilyUSA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenter Co.
Represented By: Holly Beth Lance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MlilyUSA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?