Maltese et al v. Smith Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vito Maltese and Gianni Maltese
Defendant: Smith Transport, Inc. and Edgar A. Phelps
Case Number: 3:2019cv00060
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 12 Notice Rescheduling Hearing (N) previously set for 1/3/20 at 10:00 AM before Judge Hoppe. Status Conference Call reset for 1/10/2020 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email counsel dial in information.(kld)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 Paper State Court Records received from Albemarle County Circuit Court, CL19-1278, consisting of Complaint, Interrogatories, Request for Production, Service (hnw)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Status Conference Call set for 1/3/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email counsel dial in information.(kld) Modified on 10/29/2019 - corrected year (kld).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order regarding #7 Rule 26(f)Agreed Written Plan and Amending deadlines in #4 Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/28/19. (kld)
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Scheduling Conference Call held in chambers on 10/28/2019. (kld)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Plaintiffs Gianni Maltese, Vito Maltese (Byrne, Robert)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Scheduling Conference Call set for 10/28/2019 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email counsel dial in information.(kld)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for October 19-23, 2020 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDER. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/15/19. (jcj)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Albemarle County Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/10/19. (hnw)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smith Transport, Inc. (jcj)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albemarle County Circuit Court, case number CL19-1278. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt 0423-3237752), filed by Smith Transport, Inc., Edgar A. Phelps. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Answer)(jcj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maltese et al v. Smith Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vito Maltese
Represented By: Stephen Mark Smith
Represented By: Jonathan T. Wren
Represented By: David Barnes Holt
Represented By: Robert Emmet Byrne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gianni Maltese
Represented By: Stephen Mark Smith
Represented By: Jonathan T. Wren
Represented By: David Barnes Holt
Represented By: Robert Emmet Byrne, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Janeen Beth Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar A. Phelps
Represented By: Janeen Beth Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?