Smith v. Kia Motors America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Smith
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation, Monticello Motors and Kia Motors America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00062
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Cancellation of November 15, 2019 Motion Hearing (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (hnw)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Entry of Dismissal without prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (jcj)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ashley Smith (McNew, Edward)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Venue : (CR) Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2019 02:30 PM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. (sfc)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDER. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/15/19. (jcj)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Albemarle County Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/15/19. (jcj)
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Venue by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support Motion in support of Motion to dismiss)(Bascom, Christopher)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kia Motors America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kia Motors Corporation for Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Bascom, Christopher)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Albemarle Circuit Court, case number CL19-980. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt 0423-3240207), filed by Kia Motors America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(jcj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Kia Motors America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Smith
Represented By: Edward Kyle McNew
Represented By: John Gregory Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monticello Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher William Bascom
Represented By: Christopher Channing Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?