Draper v. GB LL Holdings
Plaintiff: Cedrick Draper
Defendant: GB LL Holdings
Case Number: 3:2019cv00069
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Senior Judge Norman K. Moon for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 1/10/2020. (hnw)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 Pro Se MOTION/AFFIDAVIT for Reconsideration re #4 Order, Order Dismissing Case to Vacate Judgment by reinstatement/ Reopen of Original Proceeding by Cedrick Draper. (hnw)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Denying MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #1 filed by Cedrick Draper, ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice filed by Cedrick Draper.. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/15/19. (hnw)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 11/15/19. (hnw)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against GB LL Holdings, filed by Cedrick Draper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Attachment 2, #4 Letters to court, #5 Proposed Subpoena to Produce Documents, #6 Proposed Subpoena to Produce Documents, #7 Proposed Summons)(ck)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cedrick Draper. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ck)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Draper v. GB LL Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GB LL Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedrick Draper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?