Doe v. Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia and Chris Ghaemmaghami
Case Number: 3:2019cv00070
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 17 Notice Rescheduling Hearing (N) previously set for 1/24/20 at 1:30 PM before Judge Hoppe Scheduling Conference Call RESET for 1/24/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email counsel dial in information.(kld)
January 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Scheduling Conference Call set for 1/24/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to email counsel dial in information.(kld)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 1/2/20. (hnw)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORAL ORDER finding as moot #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint parties having filed answer within originally allotted time to file a responsive pleading. Entered by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 1/2/20. (hnw)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Chris Ghaemmaghami, Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia.(O'Brien, Blaire)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Blaire Hawkins O'Brien on behalf of Chris Ghaemmaghami, Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia (O'Brien, Blaire)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Consent Motion by Chris Ghaemmaghami, Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Ross, Marshall)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia (Ross, Marshall)
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chris Ghaemmaghami (Ross, Marshall)
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marshall H. Ross on behalf of All Defendants (Ross, Marshall)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 12/13/19. (hnw)
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 First MOTION for Protective Order and to proceed annonymously as Jane Doe . filed by Jane Doe. (Fogel, Jeffrey)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Protective Order and to proceed annonymously as Jane Doe by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fogel, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Chris Ghaemmaghami NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jcj)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Jane Doe as to Chris Ghaemmaghami.(Fogel, Jeffrey)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chris Ghaemmaghami, Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 paid by e-receipt no. 0423-3276360.), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Criminal Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rector and Visitors Of The University Of Virginia
Represented By: Blaire Hawkins O'Brien
Represented By: Marshall H. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Ghaemmaghami
Represented By: Blaire Hawkins O'Brien
Represented By: Marshall H. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Fogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?