Green-Geter v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Green-Geter
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart and Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00079
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Adopting the Rule 26(f) Report #11 and Modifying certain deadlines in the Pretrial order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/13/2020. (hnw)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 2/13/2020. (hnw)
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION for Protective Order . filed by Wal-Mart, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Howell, Victoria)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Protective Order by Wal-Mart, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc.. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (Howell, Victoria)
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Howell, Victoria)
February 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for September 22-23, 2020 at 09:30 AM in Charlottesville before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (hnw)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria Linney Howell on behalf of All Defendants (Howell, Victoria)
January 23, 2020 Filing 8 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (hnw)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 1/23/2020. (hnw)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Louisa County Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc.. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 1/23/2020. (hnw)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Beck, Donald)
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart de Mexico, S. A. de C.V., Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Beck, Donald)
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart de Mexico, S. A. de C.V., Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.. (Beck, Donald)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Wal-Mart, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (jcj)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Louisa County Circuit Court, case number CL 19-376. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400; Receipt 0423-3292698), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Answer)(jcj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green-Geter v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria Linney Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria Linney Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria Linney Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Victoria Linney Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Green-Geter
Represented By: Terry T. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?