Jackson v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff: Raymond Jackson, Jr.
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00008
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jcj)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wright Medical Technology, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Wright Medical Group, N.V. for Wright Medical Technology, Inc.. (Lifson, Roman)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Wright Medical Technology, Inc..(Lifson, Roman)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Wright Medical Technology, Inc. by Raymond Jackson, Jr (Phelan, Michael)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wright Medical Technology, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wright Medical Technology, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 by receipt no. 0423-3338181.), filed by Raymond Jr. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw) Modified on 2/26/2020 (hnw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Jackson, Jr.
Represented By: Michael George Phelan
Represented By: Brielle Marie Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright Medical Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Roman Lifson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?