Clark, Jr v. Payne et al
Plaintiff: Kelly James Clark, Jr
Defendant: Officer Glenn Tommy Payne, Louisa Sheriff's Department, Central Virginia Regional Jail, Tommy Payne, Correctional Officer Kevin Carl, Ashland Fortune, Correctional Officer Carl, Correctional Officer Colby Miller and Mr. Miller
Case Number: 3:2020cv00017
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance Reshay Robinson on behalf of Kelly James Clark, Jr (Robinson, Terrance) (Main Document 67 replaced on 5/22/2020 document not a flattened pdf) (hnw).
April 16, 2020 Filing 66 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00867. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 15, 2020 Case electronically transferred to District of Western District of Virginia. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER (Transferring Case) THIS MATTER is before the Court on its own initiative. The Western District of West Virginia would be a proper venue for this action. Accordingly, the Court will transfer this case to the Western District of Virginia pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 04/15/2020. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Initial Pretrial Conference held via telephone on 4/15/2020 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 64 ANSWER to Complaint by Kevin Carl, Correctional Officer Carl, Colby Miller, Mr. Miller, Glenn Tommy Payne, Tommy Payne.(Anderson, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER (Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File an Answer Out of Time) Defendants' Motion #59 is GRANTED. The Court will address any remaining issues raised in Plaintiffs Response to Defendant's Motion at the appropriate time (ECF No. 62). Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 04/15/2020. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Filing 62 RESPONSE to Motion re #59 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Robinson, Terrance) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Notice of Correction re 61 Exparte, Response to Motion. The filing user selected the wrong event. (Exparte Response) was selected, and (Response to Motion) should have been selected. The filing user is notified to refile the document. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 4/15/2020 at 2:00 PM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Note: Conference to be held via telephone) (rpiz) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 60 Memorandum in Support re #59 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time filed by Kevin Carl, Correctional Officer Carl, Colby Miller, Mr. Miller, Glenn Tommy Payne, Tommy Payne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Answer)(Anderson, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File Answer Out of Time by Kevin Carl, Correctional Officer Carl, Colby Miller, Mr. Miller, Glenn Tommy Payne, Tommy Payne. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anderson, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 18, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 4/17/2020 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SCHEDULING ORDER with Attachment #1 Pretrial Schedule A - Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/2/2020 at 9:00 AM before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM ORDER(Disposition of Pending Motions) granting #44 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #48 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #51 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 01/27/2020. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Amended Complaint, filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Robinson, Terrance) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 55 Memorandum in Opposition re #51 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Amended Complaint, filed by Correctional Officer Carl, Ashland Fortune, Colby Miller, Glenn Tommy Payne. (Anderson, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 54 USCA Mandate re #33 Notice of Appeal : This court's order dismissing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42(b) takes effect today. This constitutes the formal mandate of this court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (lbre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER of USCA as to #33 Notice of Appeal filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr : Upon consideration of the motion to voluntarily dismiss this case pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure, and there appearing no opposition, the court grants the motion. (lbre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 27, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kevin Carl, Ashland Fortune, Glenn Tommy Payne. (Anderson, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 51 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct #39 Amended Complaint, by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Third Amended Complaint)(Robinson, Terrance) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 50 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Robinson, Terrance) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #47 Answer to Complaint; the wrong filing event was selected. Clerk corrected docket text to reflect that it is the Memorandum in Support of ECF No. #48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. NEF was regenerated. No further action is required at this time. (sbea, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Traynham Anderson on behalf of Colby Miller (Anderson, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Colby Miller. (Anderson, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 47 Memorandum in Support of Miller's Motion to Dismiss by Colby Miller. re: #48 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Anderson, Matthew). NEF regenerated. Modified docket text on 12/23/2019 (sbea, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed Colby Miller served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020 (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 45 Memorandum in Support re #44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kevin Carl, Ashland Fortune, Glenn Tommy Payne. (Anderson, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 9, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Kevin Carl, Ashland Fortune, Glenn Tommy Payne. (Anderson, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 43 Summons Issued as to Colby Miller and sent to USM for service. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 42 DISREGARD. PLAINTIFF WAS GRANTED IFP STATUS. Summons Issued as to Colby Miller. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: REMOVE HEADER and print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (tjoh, ) Modified on 12/3/2019 to correct text(tjoh, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 41 Proposed Summons Summons of Colby Lee Miller by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Robinson, Terrance) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Notice of Correction re 40 Proposed Summons: The filing user has been notified that document (40) was incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 40 Proposed Summons Summons of Colby Miller by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Robinson, Terrance) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 39 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint against Kevin Carl, Correctional Officer Carl, Louisa County Sheriff Dept., Colby Miller, Mr. Miller, Glenn Tommy Payne, Tommy Payne, filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr.(Robinson, Terrance) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 13, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Traynham Anderson on behalf of Kevin Carl, Central Virginia Regional Jail, Louisa County Sheriff Dept., Glenn Tommy Payne (Anderson, Matthew) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 8, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-2253, USCA Case Manager J.Rice, for #33 Notice of Appeal filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (lbre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that Kelly James Clark, Jr.'s #35 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's Motion is GRANTED insofar as Plaintiff proposes to name Sheriff Ashland Fortune as a Defendant. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have 21 days from the date of entry of this Order to file its Second Amended Complaint. Insofar as Plaintiff seeks to re-name Central Virginia Regional Jail as a Defendant, Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED. See Order for additional details. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 11/4/2019. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #33 Notice of Appeal (lgar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 36 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #33 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (lgar, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Notice of Correction re: #30 Letter, #31 Amended Complaint, MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, #33 Notice of Appeal, #34 Notice of Appearance; Filing attorney filed documents using the wrong filing event and then refiled the documents with the correct filing event. Clerked termed document no. #32 ; Clerk will include the "Certificate of Service" upon receipt, and regenerate the NEF for document no. #33 ; document no. #34 was properly saved as a PDF document. (sbea, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 3, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Robinson, Terrance). Clerk included Certificate of Service page on 11/4/2019. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 11/4/2019 (sbea, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 3, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance Reshay Robinson on behalf of Kelly James Clark, Jr (Robinson, Terrance). Clerk replaced document with a PDF document on 11/4/2019. Modified docket text on 11/4/2019 (sbea, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 3, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #29 Memorandum Order by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Robinson, Terrance). Clerk replaced document to include the Certificate of Service. NEF was regenerated. Modified docket text on 11/4/2019 (sbea, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 3, 2019 Filing 32 DISREGARD - See docket entry #35 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Robinson, Terrance). Modified docket text on 11/4/2019 (sbea, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 3, 2019 Filing 31 DISREGARD - See docket entry #35 AMENDED COMPLAINT Motion for Leave to file Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Robinson, Terrance). Modified docket text on 11/4/2019 (sbea, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
November 2, 2019 Filing 30 DISREGARD - See docket entry #34 Letter Appearance (Robinson, Terrance). Modified docket text on 11/4/2019 (sbea, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM ORDER (Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) The Court finds that Plaintiffs Amended Complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted with respect to Defendant CVRJ. Accordingly, the Court will grant Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The Court finds that the Amended Complaint fails to plausibly allege a claim that establishes any reasonable inference that Plaintiff is entitled to relief, and therefore, the matter cannot proceed. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/04/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER (Granting Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) granting #10 Motion to Dismiss because Plaintiff fails to properly name Defendant. Plaintiff is notified that, in order to successfully amend his Amended Complaint, a Motion for Leave to Amend the Amended Complaint, as well as filing of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, is required. Should Plaintiff wish to do so. Plaintiff is directed to file his motion in a reasonable time not to exceed thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 10/03/2019. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. The undersigned judge RECUSES himself from presiding over this case because he has a conflict in the matter. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that the Clerk reassign this case to another United States District Judge in accordance with the Clerk's standard assignment procedure. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry E. Hudson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 05/06/2019. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on its own initiative. The plaintiff, proceeding pro se, filed several documents indicating that an attorney named Terrance Robinson assisted him. Under the Local Rules, therefore, Mr. Robinson effectively has entered an appearance for the plaintif Mr. Robinson, however, has not been admitted to practice in this Court. Accordingly, if Mr. Robinson plans to continue assisting the plaintiff in this case, the Court DIRECTS him to gain admission to this Court and become qualified to use the CM/ECF filing system within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 04/26/2019. Copies distributed as directed. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 25 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Colby Miller (no longer employed). (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kevin Carl served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019; Central Virginia Regional Jail served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019; Louisa County Sheriff Dept. served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019; Glenn Tommy Payne served on 2/11/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 23 Brief in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro, filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 20 Response to #7 Answer to Complaint, filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 19 Response to #13 Answer to Complaint, filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. The plaintiff may respond to the motions to dismiss within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 03/28/2019. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 21, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 16 Roseboro Notice by Central Virginia Regional Jail (Tunner, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Central Virginia Regional Jail. (Tunner, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Central Virginia Regional Jail. (Tunner, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Kevin Carl.(Tunner, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Central Virginia Regional Jail.(Tunner, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Louisa County Sheriff Dept.. (Tunner, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Louisa County Sheriff Dept.. (Tunner, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 Roseboro Notice by Louisa County Sheriff Dept. (Tunner, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR - MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Central Virginia Regional Jail. (Tunner, William) Modified on 3/4/2019 to correct text (tjoh, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Glenn Tommy Payne.(Tunner, William) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kevin Carl, Central Virginia Regional Jail, Louisa County Sheriff Dept., Colby Miller, Glenn Tommy Payne and sent to USM for service per Order filed 01/17/2019. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. On December 20, 2018, the Court granted the plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauper is, and directed the plaintiff to file a particularized amended complaint. (Dk. No. 2.) The plaintiff filed an amended complaint on January 9, 2019. (Dk. No. 4.) Liberally construing the amended complaint, the Court finds that the plaintiff sufficiently complied with its Order. The amended complaint now serves as the operative complaint in this case. The Court thus DIRECTS the Clerk to to issue summons upon the defendants. The Court DIRECTS the U.S. Marshal Service to serve the defendants with the summons and a copy of the amended complaint. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 01/17/2019. Copy mailed to plaintiff. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Central Virginia Regional Jail, Louisa County Sheriff Dept., Glenn Tommy Payne, Kevin Carl, Colby Miller, filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certification)(tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Central Virginia Regional Jail, Correctional Officer Carl, Louisa Sheriff Department, Mr. Miller, Tommy Payne, filed by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Attachments: #1 certification)(tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DIRECTS the plaintiff to file an amended complaint within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr on 12/20/2018. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kelly James Clark, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Local Rule 83.1 Certification)(ccol, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark, Jr v. Payne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Glenn Tommy Payne
Represented By: Matthew Traynham Anderson
Represented By: William W. Tunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisa Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Matthew Traynham Anderson
Represented By: William W. Tunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Virginia Regional Jail
Represented By: Matthew Traynham Anderson
Represented By: William W. Tunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Payne
Represented By: Matthew Traynham Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Kevin Carl
Represented By: Matthew Traynham Anderson
Represented By: William W. Tunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashland Fortune
Represented By: Matthew Traynham Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Carl
Represented By: Matthew Traynham Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Colby Miller
Represented By: Matthew Traynham Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Miller
Represented By: Matthew Traynham Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly James Clark, Jr
Represented By: Terrance Reshay Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?