Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00050
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, #9 Electronic Summons Issued, (hnw)
October 16, 2020 Filing 17 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (hnw)
October 15, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company.(Moyers, Jason) Modified on 10/15/2020 - At request of counsel, docket text was modified to reflect Amended Complaint was filed against Defendant (ham).
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Commercial Lease Agreement)(Perdue, Randall)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC (Perdue, Randall)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint by Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC.(Perdue, Randall)
October 5, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. The VAWD CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 8:00 am, October 10, 2020, through 8:00 am on Tuesday October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step one was to upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual #Upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account after the Court goes live on NextGen CM/ECF October 13, 2020. Instructions for linking you r account can be found by clicking #here. Remember you cannot link your accounts until on or after the court goes live on NextGe n October 13, 2020. If you have any additional questions please call the VAWD Clerks Office at 540-857-5100 or email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov. (ADI) (mzc)
September 29, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The Western District of Virginia will be going live on NextGen CM/ECF Tuesday, October 13, 2020. This is a Two-Step process. In Step one each attorney was to make sure they had an upgraded individual PACER account. Now in preparation for Step Two please make sure you know your VAWD CM/ECF username and password. Please manually log in to the VAWD CM/ECF system at #ht tps://ecf.vawd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/login.pl to make sure you know your current VAWD CM/ECF username and password. (do not rely on the auto-populating in your browser, because you will have to manually enter your CM/ECF username and password during the linking process after we go live on NextGen.) If you do not know your username or password please email ecf@vawd.uscourts.gov and include your bar# and contact phone#. (ADI) (mzc)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply - Responses due by 10/9/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 09/22/2020. (ssm)
September 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perdue, Randall)
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Tyree Perdue on behalf of Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC (Perdue, Randall)
September 21, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Virginia (WDVA) will be going live on the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) Tuesday, October 13, 2020. Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a two-step process. Step One is that each attorney must upgrade their individual PACER account, no shared accounts within firms will be allowed. Check and see if your PACER account is an "Upgraded" PACER account. Many PACER accounts have already been upgraded. If any of the following is true, you have an upgraded PACER account and no action is required until after the VAWD NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on October 13, 2020: 1) You have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen Court or 2) Your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014. If none of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your VAWD CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Click #here to learn how to upgrade your PACER Account. If you still have questions regarding your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center 800- 676-6856. Complete information regarding the WDVA NextGen CM/ECF implementation can be found at #NextGen Information. (mzc) (ADI)
September 21, 2020 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Reissued as to Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
September 17, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons for Essex Hand Crafted Wood Products, LLC by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Moyers, Jason)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of service of Summons & Complaint on 09/04/20 upon Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC - Suzanne Gregory (Wife, R/A Deceased)(Moyers, Jason)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael D. O'Donnell for Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company added Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 9/2/2020. (hnw)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(dg)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Essex Hand-Crated Wood Products, LLC by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Moyers, Jason)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Michael D. O'Donnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3474107. by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Moyers, Jason)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (dg)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400. Receipt number 0423-3469961), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company v. Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Guy Moyers
Represented By: Michael Dillon O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essex Hand-Crafted Wood Products, LLC
Represented By: Randall Tyree Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?