Elias v. Tahvonen
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Elias
Defendant: Gregory S. Tahvonen
Case Number: 3:2020cv00071
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Amended Complaint) . filed by Gregory S. Tahvonen. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support)(McDonald, John)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John Timothy McDonald on behalf of Gregory S. Tahvonen (McDonald, John)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. Timothy McDonald Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 1/5/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(hnw)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 Roseboro Notice re #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Amended Complaint) Deadline set for 1/29/2021. (Notice mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(hnw)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Amended Complaint) filed by Kenneth R. Elias. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(dg)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for J. Timothy McDonald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3585759. by Gregory S. Tahvonen. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Heyer, Eric)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Amended Complaint) by Gregory S. Tahvonen. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Heyer, Eric)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Gregory S. Tahvonen. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Declaration of Lourdes DiPietro, #3 Declaration of Letitia Gallman, #4 Exhibit "A")(Heyer, Eric)
December 14, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gregory S. Tahvonen, filed by Kenneth R. Elias.(dg)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth R. Elias. Gregory S. Tahvonen served on 11/23/2020, answer due 12/14/2020.(dg)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gregory S. Tahvonen.(hnw)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gregory S. Tahvonen (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400 by receipt no. 300003694.), filed by Kenneth R. Elias. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elias v. Tahvonen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory S. Tahvonen
Represented By: Eric Nathan Heyer
Represented By: John Timothy McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth R. Elias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?