Stanley v. Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nancy A. Stanley
Defendant: University of Virginia Physicians Group and Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00005
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 03/30/2021. (dg)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal Document #1 Complaint by Nancy A. Stanley. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Norton, Beth)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc., University of Virginia Physicians Group (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402. Receipt number AVAWDC-3628840 ), filed by Nancy A. Stanley. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/30/2021: #2 Sealed Unredacted Complaint) (dg). (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/30/2021) (dg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Virginia Physicians Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Insurance Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy A. Stanley
Represented By: Beth A Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?