The United States of America, for the use and benefit of Weaver Works, Inc., a Virginia Corporation v. Tesecon, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: The United States of America, for the use and benefit of Weaver Works, Inc., a Virginia Corporation
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Tesecon, Inc., Developers Surety and Indemnity Company and The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00006
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 3133
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 14 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (hnw)
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Michelle West on behalf of Developers Surety and Indemnity Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (West, Allison)
April 2, 2021 Filing 12 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Developers Surety and Indemnity Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Other Affiliate AmTrust Financial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Peerless Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Peerless Insurance Company, Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company; Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent INSCO Insurance Services, Inc., Other Affiliate AmTrust Financial Services, Inc., Other Affiliate LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Developers Surety and Indemnity Company. (Briglia, Shannon)
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Developers Surety and Indemnity Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company.(Briglia, Shannon)
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Registered Agent for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company on 3/12/2021, filed by The United States of America, for the use and benefit of Weaver Works, Inc., a Virginia Corporation.(Berry, John)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Registered Agent for The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company on 3/12/2021, filed by The United States of America, for the use and benefit of Weaver Works, Inc., a Virginia Corporation.(Berry, John)
March 30, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Registered Agent for Developers Surety and Indemnity Company on 3/12/2021, filed by The United States of America, for the use and benefit of Weaver Works, Inc., a Virginia Corporation.(Berry, John)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The United States of America, for the use and benefit of Weaver Works, Inc., a Virginia Corporation (Berry, John)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Developers Surety and Indemnity Company.(hnw)
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(hnw)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company.(hnw)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tesecon, Inc..(hnw)
February 25, 2021 John Garland Berry, in accordance with Section B.9. of the Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing and Verifying Pleadings and Papers by Electronic Means, a registered user is responsible for ensuring their mailing address, primary email address, and telephone number are kept up-to-date with this court by updating the information in their PACER account. To update your information, log into PACER.gov and click the Maintenance tab to Update this information with this court. (hnw)
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by The United States of America, for the use and benefit of Weaver Works, Inc., a Virginia Corporation (hnw)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Developers Surety and Indemnity Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Tesecon, Inc., The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402. paid by receipt AVAWDC-3632723), filed by The United States of America, for the use and benefit of Weaver Works, Inc., a Virginia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hnw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The United States of America, for the use and benefit of Weaver Works, Inc., a Virginia Corporation v. Tesecon, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Allison Michelle West
Represented By: Shannon Jill Briglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesecon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Developers Surety and Indemnity Company
Represented By: Allison Michelle West
Represented By: Shannon Jill Briglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Allison Michelle West
Represented By: Shannon Jill Briglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The United States of America, for the use and benefit of Weaver Works, Inc., a Virginia Corporation
Represented By: John Garland Berry
Represented By: John G. Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?