State Farm Life Insurance Company v. Schilling et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Judith Schilling, Ann Gaither Norris, Gail Hubbard, Deborah Baker and Northside Baptist Church of Charlottesville
Case Number: 3:2021cv00038
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Filing 20 Pro se Letter re: Status as beneficiary by Deborah Baker (hnw)
November 16, 2021 Filing 19 Pro Se Letter re: status as beneficiary by Ann Gaither Norris (dg)
November 11, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Life Insurance Company. Ann Gaither Norris served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/29/2021.(Brenner, Theodore)
November 9, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Life Insurance Company. Judith Schilling served on 11/5/2021, answer due 11/29/2021.(Brenner, Theodore)
November 9, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Life Insurance Company. Northside Baptist Church of Charlottesville served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/29/2021.(Brenner, Theodore)
November 9, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Life Insurance Company. Gail Hubbard served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/29/2021.(Brenner, Theodore)
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by State Farm Life Insurance Company. Deborah Baker served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/29/2021.(Brenner, Theodore)
November 3, 2021 Filing 13 Electronic Summons Issued as to Judith Schilling NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 Electronic Summons Issued as to Ann Gaither Norris NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
November 3, 2021 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Issued as to Gail Hubbard NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 Electronic Summons Issued as to Northside Baptist Church of Charlottesville NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 Electronic Summons Issued as to Deborah Baker NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(hnw)
November 2, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Summons for Northside Baptist Church of Charlottesville by State Farm Life Insurance Company (Brenner, Theodore)
November 2, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Summons for Deborah Baker by State Farm Life Insurance Company (Brenner, Theodore)
November 2, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Summons for Gail Hubbard by State Farm Life Insurance Company (Brenner, Theodore)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Ann Gaither Norris by State Farm Life Insurance Company (Brenner, Theodore)
November 2, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Judith Schilling by State Farm Life Insurance Company (Brenner, Theodore)
November 1, 2021 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Life Insurance Company. (Brenner, Theodore)
October 27, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Requirement to State Farm Life Insurance Company - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ca)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 Interpleader Complaint against Deborah Baker, Gail Hubbard, Ann Gaither Norris, Northside Baptist Church of Charlottesville, Judith Schilling (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402., receipt# AVAWDC-3818926), filed by State Farm Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Life Insurance Company v. Schilling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexander Spotswood de Witt
Represented By: Theodore Ira Brenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Schilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Gaither Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northside Baptist Church of Charlottesville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?