Defenders of Wildlife et al v. United States Forest Service
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife and Southern Environmental Law Center
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Case Number: 3:2022cv00034
Filed: June 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Joint MOTION to Proceed by Quarterly Joint Status Report. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 08/01/2022. (am) (Main Document 18 replaced on 8/1/2022 to correct docketing error) (am).
July 28, 2022 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Proceed by Quarterly Joint Status Report by United States Forest Service. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Bugbee, Sara)
July 7, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on United States Forest Service, Randy Moore, Merrick Garland, Christopher Kavanaugh on June 9, 2022, filed by Defenders of Wildlife, Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Gall, Spencer)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer United States Forest Service answer due 7/28/2022. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 07/06/2022. (dg)
July 6, 2022 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by United States Forest Service. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bugbee, Sara)
June 14, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Gargan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gargan, Henry)
June 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Susannah Knox on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Knox, Susannah)
June 14, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick Hunter on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hunter, James)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 06/14/2022. (dg)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney James Patrick Hunter for Defenders of Wildlife,James Patrick Hunter for Southern Environmental Law Center added Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 06/14/2022. (dg)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 06/14/2022. (dg)
June 13, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Susannah Knox to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3968621. by Defenders of Wildlife, Southern Environmental Law Center. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gall, Spencer)
June 13, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for J. Patrick Hunter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3968619. by Defenders of Wildlife, Southern Environmental Law Center. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gall, Spencer)
June 13, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Henry Gargan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3968618. by Defenders of Wildlife, Southern Environmental Law Center. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gall, Spencer)
June 9, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Forest Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued, #2 Summons Issued, #3 Summons Issued)(dg)
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southern Environmental Law Center (dg)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defenders of Wildlife (dg)
June 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Forest Service (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-3965933.), filed by Defenders of Wildlife, Southern Environmental Law Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(dg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Defenders of Wildlife et al v. United States Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Spencer Thomas Gall
Represented By: Henry Gargan
Represented By: James Patrick Hunter
Represented By: Susannah Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Environmental Law Center
Represented By: Spencer Thomas Gall
Represented By: Henry Gargan
Represented By: James Patrick Hunter
Represented By: Susannah Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Forest Service
Represented By: Sara Kay Bugbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?