Wright v. Trinity Packaging Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Marie Wright
Defendant: ProAmpac, LLC, ProAmpac Intermediate, Inc., Trinity Packaging Corporation and ProAmpac Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00062
Filed: November 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Jackson L Kiser
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jessica Marie Wright. ProAmpac Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 12/29/2018, answer due 2/27/2019; Trinity Packaging Corporation waiver sent on 12/29/2018, answer due 2/27/2019.(Strelka, Thomas)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Jennifer L. Parent to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Jennifer L. Parent for ProAmpac Holdings, Inc. and for Trinity Packaging Corporation added. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 12/13/18. (ham)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Jennifer Parent to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3032268. by ProAmpac Holdings, Inc., Trinity Packaging Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brown, Steven)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by ProAmpac Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ProAmpac PG Borrower LLC for ProAmpac Holdings, Inc.. (Brown, Steven)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trinity Packaging Corporation identifying Corporate Parent ProAmpac Holdings Inc. for Trinity Packaging Corporation. (Brown, Steven)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven David Brown on behalf of ProAmpac Holdings, Inc., Trinity Packaging Corporation (Brown, Steven)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Trinity Packaging Corporation, filed by Jessica Marie Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Strelka, Thomas)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Trinity Packaging Corporation and ProAmpac, LLC. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachment: #1 Electronic Summons Issued as to ProAmpac, LLC)(ham)
November 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ProAmpac Intermediate, Inc., ProAmpac, LLC, Trinity Packaging Corporation (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00; pay.gov receipt number 0423-3015424), filed by Jessica Marie Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Performance Evaluation, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Trinity Packaging Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProAmpac, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProAmpac Intermediate, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Packaging Corporation
Represented By: Steven David Brown
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Parent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProAmpac Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Steven David Brown
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Parent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Marie Wright
Represented By: Norvell Winston West, IV.
Represented By: Linda Leigh Strelka
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Strelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?