George v. Averett University of Danville, Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas George
Defendant: Averett University of Danville, Virginia, Leslie Villarose and Tiffany McKillip Franks
Case Number: 4:2019cv00008
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Jackson L Kiser
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 20 Response re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion . filed by Averett University of Danville, Virginia, Tiffany McKillip Franks, Leslie Villarose. (Johnson, Harold)
April 8, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Nicholas George. (Jabaly, Peter)
April 4, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons & Complaint on Averett University of Danville, Virginia filed by Nicholas George.(Jabaly, Peter) Modified on 4/4/2019 - corrected docket text (ham).
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons & Complaint on Leslie Villarose in her official capacity as Dean of Students of Averett University of Danville, Virginia filed by Nicholas George.(Jabaly, Peter) Modified on 4/4/2019 - corrected docket text (ham).
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons & Complaint on Tiffany McKillip Franks in her official capacity as President of Averett University of Danville, Virginia filed by Nicholas George.(Jabaly, Peter) Modified on 4/4/2019 - corrected docket text (ham).
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Anthony Jabaly on behalf of Nicholas George (Jabaly, Peter)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Retaining Case. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 4/2/2019. (mlh)
April 2, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Averett University of Danville, Virginia, Tiffany McKillip Franks, Nicholas George, Leslie Villarose. (mlh)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM: (CR) Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2019 at 03:00 PM in Danville before Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser. (ham)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Requested Hearing by Attorney for Averett University of Danville, Virginia, Tiffany McKillip Franks, Leslie Villarose re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion to Dismiss hearing date May 21, 2019, at 3:00pm, at U.S. District Court, U.S. District Court for the Western Division of Virginia, Danville Division, before Judge Kiser. Confirmation notice to be sent by the Clerk's Office. (Johnson, Harold)
April 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) Jury Trial set for 2/10/2020 - 2/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Danville before Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ham)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRETRIAL ORDER, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 3/25/2019. (mlh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (mlh)
March 25, 2019 Filing 7 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Averett University of Danville, Virginia (Johnson, Harold)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Averett University of Danville, Virginia, Tiffany McKillip Franks, Leslie Villarose. (Johnson, Harold)
March 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Averett University of Danville, Virginia, Tiffany McKillip Franks, Leslie Villarose. (Johnson, Harold)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Tiffany McKillip Franks. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ham)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Leslie Villarose. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ham)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Averett University of Danville, Virginia. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ham)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Averett University of Danville, Virginia; Tiffany McKillip Franks; Leslie Villarose (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00; pay.gov receipt number 0423-3078221) filed by Nicholas George. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. Averett University of Danville, Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Averett University of Danville, Virginia
Represented By: Harold Edward Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Villarose
Represented By: Harold Edward Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany McKillip Franks
Represented By: Harold Edward Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas George
Represented By: Anthony Roelof Coppola
Represented By: Peter Anthony Jabaly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?