Huffstetler v. Burkle North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Andrea Leigh Huffstetler
Defendant: Robert Burkle GmbH, Stiles Machinery, Inc., Burkle North America, Inc., CRB Electrical & Mechanical Inc. and A & A Mechanical, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00041
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Jackson L Kiser
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Hooe, Laura)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 Paper State Court Records received from Pittsylvania County Circuit Court, CL19-352, consisting of Table of Contents, pages 1-123 and service paperwork. (Attachments: #1 Pages 51-99, #2 Pages 100-123 and service paperwork, #3 Additional service paperwork)(ham)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Olaf Rohrbeck c/o Scott C. Hartin on 10/15/2019 by Andrea Leigh Huffstetler. Waiver of Service due by 12/14/2019.(Edwards, Evans)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura May Hooe on behalf of Stiles Machinery, Inc. (Hooe, Laura)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew James Hundley on behalf of Stiles Machinery, Inc. (Hundley, Matthew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Burkle North America, Inc..(Hartin, Scott)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stiles Machinery, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Homag Group AG for Stiles Machinery, Inc.. (Lonas, Carl)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint Complaint by Stiles Machinery, Inc..(Lonas, Carl)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (ham)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Pittsylvania County Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 10/3/19. (ham)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Burkle North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Buerkle VerwaltungsGmbH, Corporate Grandparent Robert Buerkle GmbH, Corporate Grandparent Auctus Neunundachtzigste BeteiligungsgesellschaftmbH. (ham)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pittsylvania County Circuit Court, case number CL19-352 (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00; pay.gov Receipt Number 0423-3240244) filed by Burkle North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Third Amended Complaint and service paperwork, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Answer and Grounds of Defense, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huffstetler v. Burkle North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Burkle GmbH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stiles Machinery, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Dewayne Lonas
Represented By: Matthew James Hundley
Represented By: Laura May Hooe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burkle North America, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Robert Schmeding
Represented By: Scott Collins Hartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRB Electrical & Mechanical Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Piasta
Represented By: William Paul Wallace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & A Mechanical, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Piasta
Represented By: William Paul Wallace, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Leigh Huffstetler
Represented By: Glenn Walthall Pulley
Represented By: Amanda M. Morgan
Represented By: Andrew Daniel Finnicum
Represented By: Evans Greenwood Edwards
Represented By: Joseph Courtney Shipman
Represented By: Gregory D. Habeeb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?