Luck v. Saul
Plaintiff: Janice Wilson Luck
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2019cv00045
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Jackson L Kiser
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Mail Return Receipt by Janice Wilson Luck. Andrew Saul served on 12/13/2019, answer due 4/13/2020.(Williams, Jerry)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ham)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 SS Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (ham)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If needed, forms may also be found at #www.vawd.uscourts.gov/forms.aspx. Signed by Senior Judge Jackson L. Kiser on 11/25/19. (ham)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Janice Wilson Luck. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Janice Wilson Luck. (ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luck v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Wilson Luck
Represented By: Jerry L. Williams, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?