Laird v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Laird
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., DePuy International Limited and DePuy, Inc.
In Re: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00006
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 Acknowledgment Email RECEIVED from Northern District of Texas for Acknowledgment of Opening of Civil Case Transferred: CASE: 4:20-cv-00006 - DETAILS: Case transferred from Virginia Western has been opened in Northern District of Texas as case 3:20-cv-00349, filed 02/13/2020. (mlh)
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order transferring case to Northern District of Texas. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 2/12/2020. (mlh)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of MDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-330) from Northern District of Texas as to MDL No. 2244. (mlh)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS to the Clerk of the Multidistrict Panel (MDL Docket No. 2244). (Attachment: #1 Cover Letter)(mlh)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DePuy International Limited, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00; receipt number 0423-3309267), filed by Matthew J. Laird. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mlh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laird v. DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Laird
Represented By: Randall Troy Trost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc. Pinnacle Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy International Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?