McCall v. Flagship Credit Acceptance
Plaintiff: Shani Adia McCall
Defendant: Flagship Credit Acceptance
Case Number: 4:2021cv00014
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If needed, forms may also be found at #www.vawd.uscourts.gov/forms.aspx Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 3/15/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(ham)
March 15, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00307. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: This Court will therefore transfer this action to the Western District of Virginia under Section 1391(b)(2) and the undersigned's authority granted by Rule 2(a)(3) of the Court's Miscellaneous Order No. 6 on 3/11/2021 to allow any party to file an objection to Judge Boyle within 14 days after being served with a copy of this order, see FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a). (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 2/18/2021) (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/15/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shani Adia McCall. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/15/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Shani Adia McCall. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/15/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Flagship Credit Acceptance filed by Shani Adia McCall. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/15/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/15/2021.]
February 11, 2021 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. SCREEN case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 3/15/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Flagship Credit Acceptance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shani Adia McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flagship Credit Acceptance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?