Nobili v. Chevron USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donnamarie Nobili
Defendant: Williams Olefins LLC, Pharmacia Corp., South Hampton Refining, Co., Sun Oil Co., Occidental Chemical Corp., Continental oil Co., EPEC Corp., E.I. Du Pont de Neumours and Co., TPC Group LLC, BP Amoco Chemical Co., TPC Holdings Corp., Tennessee Gas Pipeline Co., Shell Chemical LP, Tenneco Inc., BP Corporation of North America, Eastman Chemical Co., Solutia, Inc., Oxy USA Inc., ConocoPhillips Co., Mobil Oil Corp., ConocoPhillips, Chevron Phillips Chemical Co., LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., El Paso Corporation, Mitsui and Co. USA Inc., Huntsman Petrochemical, LLC, OxyChem, Westlake Chemical Corp., Univar USA Inc., Citgo Petroleum Corporation, Union Texas Petroleum Corp., Atlantic Richfield Company, Texaco, Inc., American Oil Co., Exxon Mobil Corp., The Dow Chemical Co., Union Oil Company of California, Chevron USA, Inc., South Hampton Resources, Inc., Texaco Inc., Mitsubishi International Corp., Sunoco LP, Shell Oil Company, Sunoco, Inc., Sabic Americas, Inc., El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., LLC., Monsanto Co., BP Products North America, Inc., Texas Petrochemicals LP and Chevron Philips Chemical Co, LP
Case Number: 4:2021cv00022
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Filing 145 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Motion Hearing held on 6/22/2021 re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement filed by Exxon Mobil Corp., Mobil Oil Corp., Westlake Chemical Corp.. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Judy Webb) (mka)
June 16, 2021 Filing 144 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (ham)
June 16, 2021 Filing 143 Notice of Filing Requirement to Chevron Philips Chemical Co, LP; Chevron Phillips Chemical Co., LLC; Citgo Petroleum Corporation; Occidental Chemical Corp.; Oxy USA Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ham)
June 16, 2021 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Gail Foster Bird on behalf of Citgo Petroleum Corporation (Foster Bird, Melissa)
June 16, 2021 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Gail Foster Bird on behalf of Chevron Philips Chemical Co, LP, Chevron Phillips Chemical Co., LLC (Foster Bird, Melissa)
June 16, 2021 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Gail Foster Bird on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corp., Oxy USA Inc. (Foster Bird, Melissa)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Oral ORDER granting #130 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Adrien Caulder Pickard terminated. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 6/14/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)
June 9, 2021 Filing 138 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Williams Olefins LLC.(Brem, Michael)
June 8, 2021 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brem on behalf of Williams Olefins LLC (Brem, Michael)
June 8, 2021 Filing 136 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Motion Hearing set for 6/22/2021 11:00 AM in via Zoom before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (mka)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #128 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael L. Brem. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 6/7/2021. (ham)
June 4, 2021 Filing 134 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Williams Olefins LLC identifying Corporate Parent NOVA Chemicals Corporation, Other Affiliate NOVA Chemicals Inc. for Williams Olefins LLC. (Daniel, James) (Main Document 134 replaced on 6/4/2021) (ham). Modified on 6/4/2021 - Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document (ham).
June 4, 2021 Filing 133 Notice of Filing Requirement to Williams Olefins LLC - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ham)
June 2, 2021 Filing 132 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Schmalfeld on behalf of Chevron USA, Inc., Huntsman Petrochemical, LLC, Texaco Inc., Union Oil Company of California (Schmalfeld, Jonathan) (Main Document 132 replaced on 6/2/2021) (ham). Modified on 6/2/2021 - Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document (ham).
June 2, 2021 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry J. Chilton on behalf of Chevron USA, Inc., Huntsman Petrochemical, LLC, Texaco Inc., Union Oil Company of California (Chilton, Larry) (Main Document 131 replaced on 6/2/2021) (ham). Modified on 6/2/2021 - Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document (ham).
June 2, 2021 Filing 130 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by South Hampton Refining, Co.. (Pickard, Adrien)
June 2, 2021 Filing 129 NOTICE by Donnamarie Nobili of Service of Subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copies of Subpoenas)(White, Adam)
June 2, 2021 Filing 128 MOTION for Michael L. Brem to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3713952. by Williams Olefins LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exh A - Application for Admission, #2 Exh B - Affidavit of Brem)(Gammon, Tyler)
June 2, 2021 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler Brent Gammon on behalf of Williams Olefins LLC (Gammon, Tyler)
June 2, 2021 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. L. Daniel on behalf of Williams Olefins LLC (Daniel, James)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Oral ORDER denying as moot #82 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 6/2/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER defendant SABIC Americas, Inc. be DISMISSED without prejudice as to all claims, causes of action and parties. Sabic Americas, Inc. terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/27/2021. (al)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting #92 MOTION for Larry J. Chilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/24/2021. (al)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting #93 MOTION for Jonathan E. Schmalfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/24/2021. (al)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #94 MOTION for Bill T. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/24/2021. (al)
May 25, 2021 Filing 120 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Flora on behalf of E.I. Du Pont de Neumours and Co., Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company (Flora, Robert)
May 24, 2021 Filing 119 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by South Hampton Refining, Co. identifying Corporate Parent Texas Oil & Chemical Co., II, Inc., Other Affiliate Trecora Resources for South Hampton Refining, Co.. (Trumble, Robert)
May 24, 2021 Filing 118 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Donnamarie Nobili (White, Adam)
May 24, 2021 Filing 117 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by South Hampton Refining, Co..(Trumble, Robert)
May 24, 2021 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Michael Trumble on behalf of South Hampton Refining, Co. (Trumble, Robert)
May 21, 2021 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance for Christopher Ege by Christopher Charles Ege on behalf of Sabic Americas, Inc. (Ege, Christopher)
May 21, 2021 Filing 114 NOTICE of Appearance for Christopher Ege by Ashley Presson on behalf of Sabic Americas, Inc. (Presson, Ashley)
May 21, 2021 Filing 113 NOTICE of Appearance for Ashley Presson by Ashley Presson on behalf of Sabic Americas, Inc. (Presson, Ashley)
May 21, 2021 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Monique M. Weiner on behalf of E.I. Du Pont de Neumours and Co., Shell Chemical LP, Shell Oil Company (Weiner, Monique)
May 20, 2021 Filing 111 RESPONSE in Support re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement . filed by Exxon Mobil Corp., Mobil Oil Corp., Westlake Chemical Corp.. (Pulley, Glenn)
May 20, 2021 Filing 110 Notice of Filing Requirement to South Hampton Refining, Co. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ham)
May 20, 2021 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Stofko, I on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., Mobil Oil Corp., Westlake Chemical Corp. (Stofko, Christopher)
May 19, 2021 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by Vaughn Schultz on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., Mobil Oil Corp., Westlake Chemical Corp. (Schultz, Vaughn)
May 19, 2021 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Mountain on behalf of Sun Oil Co., Sunoco, Inc. (Mountain, Chad)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER dismissing without prejudice all claims as to Texas Petrochemicals LP, TPC Group LLC and TPC Holdings Corp. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/17/2021. (ham) Modified on 5/19/2021 - corrected docket text to indicate without prejudice (ham).
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Oral ORDER granting #79 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/14/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)
May 14, 2021 Filing 104 NOTICE by South Hampton Refining, Co. Joinder in and Consent to Removal (Pickard, Adrien)
May 13, 2021 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Edgar Jarvis on behalf of Sunoco, Inc. and Sun Oil Co. (Jarvis, Howard) Modified on 5/14/2021 - Corrected docket text (ham).
May 13, 2021 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane K Bounds on behalf of EPEC Corp., El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., LLC., Tennessee Gas Pipeline Co. (Bounds, Diane)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting #86 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ashley R. Presson. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/12/2021. (ham)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #85 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher C. Ege. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/12/2021. (ham)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #67 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Chad D. Mountain. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/12/2021. (ham)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #61 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Howard E. Jarvis. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/12/2021. (ham)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #40 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher D. Stofko. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/12/2021. (ham)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER granting #39 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Vaughn K. Schultz. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/12/2021. (ham)
May 13, 2021 Filing 95 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement . filed by Donnamarie Nobili. (White, Adam)
May 12, 2021 Filing 94 MOTION for Bill T. Walker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3698517. by Donnamarie Nobili. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order for PHV admission)(White, Adam)
May 12, 2021 Filing 93 MOTION for Jonathan E. Schmalfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3698503. by Chevron USA, Inc., Huntsman Petrochemical, LLC, Texaco Inc., Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reeves, Eric)
May 12, 2021 Filing 92 MOTION for Larry J. Chilton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3698468. by Chevron USA, Inc., Huntsman Petrochemical, LLC, Texaco Inc., Union Oil Company of California. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reeves, Eric)
May 12, 2021 Filing 91 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Donnamarie Nobili (White, Adam)
May 12, 2021 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett J. Young on behalf of ConocoPhillips Co. (Young, Brett)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #73 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Diane K. Bounds. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/11/2021. (ham)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #54 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Bradley J. Rutledge. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/11/2021. (ham)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #53 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brett J. Young. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/11/2021. (ham)
May 11, 2021 Filing 86 MOTION for Ashley R. Presson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3697137. by Sabic Americas, Inc.. (Schneider, Brian)
May 11, 2021 Filing 85 MOTION for Christopher C. Ege to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3697095. by Sabic Americas, Inc.. (Schneider, Brian)
May 11, 2021 Filing 84 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sabic Americas, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent SABIC US Holdings LP for Sabic Americas, Inc.. (Schneider, Brian)
May 11, 2021 Filing 83 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #82 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by Sabic Americas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Schneider, Brian)
May 11, 2021 Filing 82 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Sabic Americas, Inc.. (Schneider, Brian)
May 11, 2021 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrien Caulder Pickard on behalf of South Hampton Refining, Co. (Pickard, Adrien)
May 10, 2021 Filing 79 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Plead in Response to Complaint by South Hampton Refining, Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Pickard, Adrien)
May 10, 2021 Filing 78 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mitsui and Co. USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mitsui & Co. Ltd., Corporate Parent MBK USA Holdings, Inc. for Mitsui and Co. USA Inc.. (Conn, Martin)
May 10, 2021 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Mitsui and Co. USA Inc..(Conn, Martin)
May 10, 2021 Filing 76 NOTICE by Mitsui and Co. USA Inc. Joinder in and Consent to Removal (Conn, Martin)
May 10, 2021 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance Jonathan B. Shoebotham by James Wilson Jennings, Jr on behalf of Monsanto Co., Pharmacia Corp., Solutia, Inc. (Jennings, James)
May 10, 2021 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by EPEC Corp., El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., LLC., Tennessee Gas Pipeline Co..(Noonan, Jeanne)
May 7, 2021 ANSWERS to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - located at Docket Entry #80 State Court Record: The Dow Chemical Co. at Page #37; Solutia Inc., Pharmacia Corp. & Monsanto Co. at Attachment #1 Page #2; Chevron Phillips Chemical Co, LP at Attachment #1 Page #16; American Oil Co., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Amoco Chemical Co. & BP Products North America, Inc. at Attachment #2 Page #21; Occidental Chemical Corp. at Attachment #2, Page #37; Citgo Petroleum Corporation at Attachment #3 Page #15; Honeywell International, Inc. at Attachment #3 Page #42; Oxy USA Inc. at Attachment #4, Page #8; ConocoPhillips Co. at Attachment #4, Page #36; Mitsubishi International Corp. at Attachment #5, Page #3; ConocoPhillips Company at Attachment #5, Page #17. (ham)
May 7, 2021 Filing 80 Paper State Court Records received from Danville City Circuit Court, CL21-092 (Table of Contents beginning on Page 2). (Attachments: #1 Pages 51 - 100, #2 Pages 101 - 150, #3 Pages 151 - 200, #4 Pages 201- 250, #5 Pages 251 - 300, #6 Pages 301 - 350, #7 Pages 351 - 400, #8 Pages 401 - 450, #9 Pages 451 - 500, #10 Pages 501 - 550, #11 Pages 551 - 588)(ham)
May 7, 2021 Filing 73 MOTION for Diane K. Bounds to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3695000. by EPEC Corp., El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., LLC., Tennessee Gas Pipeline Co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Diane K. Bounds, #2 Proposed Order)(Noonan, Jeanne)
May 7, 2021 Filing 72 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Kinder Morgan, Inc. for El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., LLC.. (Noonan, Jeanne)
May 7, 2021 Filing 71 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tennessee Gas Pipeline Co. identifying Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan, Inc., Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Operations LLC "A", Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, LP, Other Affiliate Kinder Morgan GP LLC for Tennessee Gas Pipeline Co.. (Noonan, Jeanne)
May 7, 2021 Filing 70 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by EPEC Corp. identifying Corporate Parent El Paso Services Holding Company, Corporate Parent El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Company, Corporate Parent Kinder Morgan, Inc. for EPEC Corp.. (Noonan, Jeanne)
May 7, 2021 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan on behalf of EPEC Corp., El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., LLC., Tennessee Gas Pipeline Co. (Noonan, Jeanne)
May 7, 2021 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C. Dillard on behalf of Honeywell International, Inc. (Dillard, Stephen)
May 7, 2021 Filing 67 MOTION for Chad D. Mountain to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3694512. by Sun Oil Co., Sunoco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reeves, Eric)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #51 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lauren H. Brogdon. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/7/2021. (ham)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #50 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephen C. Dillard. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/6/2021. (ham)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #48 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert J. Flora. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/6/2021. (ham)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Monique M. Weiner. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/6/2021. (ham)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #44 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jonathan B. Shoebotham. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/6/2021. (ham)
May 5, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION for Howard E. Jarvis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3693094. by Sun Oil Co., Sunoco, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Reeves, Eric)
May 4, 2021 Filing 60 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Amoco Chemical Co. identifying Corporate Parent INEOS US Petrochem LLC for BP Amoco Chemical Co.. (Schwertz, Carl)
May 4, 2021 Filing 59 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Products North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent bp p.l.c. for BP Products North America, Inc.. (Schwertz, Carl)
May 4, 2021 Filing 58 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by BP Corporation of North America identifying Corporate Parent bp p.l.c. for BP Corporation of North America. (Schwertz, Carl)
May 4, 2021 Filing 57 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Richfield Company identifying Corporate Parent bp p.l.c. for Atlantic Richfield Company. (Schwertz, Carl)
May 4, 2021 Filing 56 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Oil Co. identifying Corporate Parent bp p.l.c. for American Oil Co.. (Schwertz, Carl)
May 4, 2021 Filing 55 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by American Oil Co., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Amoco Chemical Co., BP Corporation of North America, BP Products North America, Inc..(Schwertz, Carl)
May 4, 2021 Filing 54 MOTION for Brad Rutledge to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3691319. by ConocoPhillips Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order granting ConocoPhillips' pro hac vice motion for B. Rutledge)(Brydges, Brian)
May 4, 2021 Filing 53 MOTION for Brett J. Young to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3691302. by ConocoPhillips Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order granting Honeywell's pro hac vice motion for B. Young)(Brydges, Brian)
May 4, 2021 Filing 52 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ConocoPhillips Co. (Brydges, Brian)
May 4, 2021 Filing 51 MOTION for Lauren Brogdon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3691204. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order granting Honeywell's pro hac vice motion for L. Brogdon)(Brydges, Brian)
May 4, 2021 Filing 50 MOTION for Stephen C. Dillard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3691136. by Honeywell International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of proposed order granting Honeywell's pro hac vice motion for S. Dillard)(Brydges, Brian)
May 4, 2021 Filing 49 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Honeywell International, Inc. (Brydges, Brian)
May 3, 2021 Filing 48 MOTION for Robert J. Flora, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3691003. by E.I. Du Pont de Neumours and Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Thompson, Lori)
May 3, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION for Monique M. Weiner, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3691002. by E.I. Du Pont de Neumours and Co.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Thompson, Lori)
May 3, 2021 Filing 46 Original ANSWER to Complaint by Shell Chemical LP.(Thompson, Lori)
May 3, 2021 Filing 45 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shell Chemical LP identifying Other Affiliate Shell Oil Co., Other Affiliate SCOGI GP for Shell Chemical LP. (Thompson, Lori)
May 3, 2021 Filing 44 MOTION for Jonathan Shoebotham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3690573. by Monsanto Co., Pharmacia Corp., Solutia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Jennings, James)
May 3, 2021 Filing 43 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Monsanto Co., Pharmacia Corp., Solutia, Inc. (Jennings, James)
May 3, 2021 Filing 42 AMENDED Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Univar USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Univar Solutions, Inc. for Univar USA Inc. (Reeves, Eric) Modified on 5/3/2021 - Corrected docket text to indicate Amended Document #30 (ham).
April 30, 2021 Filing 41 AMENDED Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sun Oil Co., Sunoco, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Partners, LP, Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Equity, LP, Corporate Parent Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) for Sun Oil Co., Sunoco, Inc.. (Reeves, Eric) Modified on 4/30/2021 - Corrected docket text to indicate Amended Document #32 (ham).
April 30, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Christopher D. Stofko to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3689193. by Exxon Mobil Corp., Mobil Oil Corp., Westlake Chemical Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pulley, Glenn)
April 30, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION for Vaughn K. Schultz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-3689163. by Exxon Mobil Corp., Mobil Oil Corp., Westlake Chemical Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pulley, Glenn)
April 30, 2021 Filing 38 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement . filed by Exxon Mobil Corp., Mobil Oil Corp., Westlake Chemical Corp.. (Pulley, Glenn)
April 30, 2021 Filing 37 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement by Exxon Mobil Corp., Mobil Oil Corp., Westlake Chemical Corp.. (Pulley, Glenn)
April 30, 2021 Filing 36 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Westlake Chemical Corp. (Pulley, Glenn)
April 30, 2021 Filing 35 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Exxon Mobil Corp., Mobil Oil Corp. (Pulley, Glenn)
April 30, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Morgan on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., Mobil Oil Corp., Westlake Chemical Corp. (Morgan, Amanda)
April 30, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Walthall Pulley on behalf of Exxon Mobil Corp., Mobil Oil Corp., Westlake Chemical Corp. (Pulley, Glenn)
April 30, 2021 Filing 32 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sun Oil Co., Sunoco, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Partners, LP, Corporate Parent Energy Transfer Equity, LP, Corporate Parent Sunoco, Inc. (R&M) for Sun Oil Co., Sunoco, Inc.. (Reeves, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Sun Oil Co., Sunoco, Inc..(Reeves, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 30 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Univar USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Univar Solutions, Inc. for Univar USA Inc.. (Reeves, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 29 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Univar USA Inc..(Reeves, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 28 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Huntsman Petrochemical, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Huntsman Petrochemical, LLC. (Reeves, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Huntsman Petrochemical, LLC.(Reeves, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Joinder in and Consent to Removal by Huntsman Petrochemical, LLC. (Reeves, Eric) Modified on 4/30/2021 - Docket text was modified to reflect the correct docket entry (ham).
April 30, 2021 Filing 25 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Oil Company of California identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Union Oil Company of California. (Reeves, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Union Oil Company of California.(Reeves, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 23 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Texaco Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Texaco Inc.. (Reeves, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Texaco Inc..(Reeves, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 21 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chevron USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Chevron USA, Inc.. (Reeves, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Chevron USA, Inc..(Reeves, Eric)
April 30, 2021 Filing 19 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mitsubishi International Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Mitsubishi Corporation for Mitsubishi International Corp.. (Hearn, David)
April 29, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Eastman Chemical Co..(Talbott, Frank)
April 29, 2021 Filing 17 Original ANSWER to Complaint by Shell Oil Company.(Thompson, Lori)
April 29, 2021 Filing 16 Scheduling Letter (mka) (Main Document 16 replaced on 4/29/2021 to correct typo) (mka).
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Danville City Circuit Court. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/28/2021. (Order mailed to Danville City Circuit Court via US Mail)(ham)
April 28, 2021 Filing 14 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips Co. identifying Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips for ConocoPhillips Co.. (Brydges, Brian)
April 28, 2021 Filing 13 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International, Inc. (Brydges, Brian)
April 28, 2021 Filing 12 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Dow Chemical Co. identifying Corporate Parent Dow Inc. (Kuhnel, Paul) Modified on 4/28/2021 - Docket text was modified to reflect the correct docket entry (ham).
April 28, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by The Dow Chemical Co.(Kuhnel, Paul)
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 Original ANSWER to Complaint by E.I. Du Pont de Neumours and Co..(Thompson, Lori)
April 27, 2021 Filing 9 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eastman Chemical Co. (Talbott, Frank)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Solutia, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Eastman Chemical Company for Solutia, Inc.. (Jennings, James)
April 27, 2021 Filing 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pharmacia Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Pfizer Inc., Corporate Parent Wyeth Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Anacor Pharmaceuticals, Inc. for Pharmacia Corp.. (Jennings, James)
April 27, 2021 Filing 6 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Co. identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Co.. (Jennings, James)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Filing Requirement to American Oil Co., Atlantic Richfield Company, BP Amoco Chemical Co., BP Corporation of North America, BP Products North America, Inc., Chevron USA, Inc., ConocoPhillips Co., Continental oil Co., EPEC Corp., Eastman Chemical Co., El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., LLC., Exxon Mobil Corp., Honeywell International, Inc., Mitsubishi International Corp., Mobil Oil Corp., Monsanto Co., Pharmacia Corp., Sabic Americas, Inc., Shell Chemical LP, Solutia, Inc., Sun Oil Co., Sunoco, Inc., Tennessee Gas Pipeline Co., Texaco Inc., Texaco, Inc., The Dow Chemical Co., Union Oil Company of California, Univar USA Inc., Westlake Chemical Corp. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (ham)
April 26, 2021 Kevin T. Hadden; Williams R. Sievers; Thomas R. Waskom; Carl R. Schwertz; Eric G. Reeves; Christan F. Tucker; Brian J. Schneider: in accordance with Section B.9. of the Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing and Verifying Pleadings and Papers by Electronic Means, a registered user is responsible for ensuring their mailing address, primary email address, and telephone number are kept up-to-date with this court by updating the information in their PACER account. To update your information, log into PACER.gov and click the Maintenance tab to Update this information with this court. (ham)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by E.I. Du Pont de Neumours and Co. identifying Corporate Parent Corteva, Inc. for E.I. Du Pont de Neumours and Co.. (Thompson, Lori)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shell Oil Company identifying Corporate Parent Shell Petroleum, Inc.; Shell Petroleum N.V.; Royal Dutch Shell. (Thompson, Lori) Modified on 4/26/2021 - added corporate parents (ham).
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 JOINDER IN AND CONSENT TO REMOVAL by The Dow Chemical Co. (ham)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Danville City Circuit Court, case number CL21-092 (Filing & Administrative fee $402.00; pay.gov Receipt Number CVAWDC-3682803) filed by E.I. Du Pont de Neumours and Co. & Shell Oil Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: State Court Service of Process & Complaint as to E.I. Du Pont de Neumours and Co., #2 Exhibit 2: State Court Service of Process & Complaint as to Shell Oil Company, #3 Exhibit 3: State Court All Served Pleadings, #4 Exhibit 4: State Court Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit 5: State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit 6: Executed Consents, #7 Exhibit 7: State Court Agreed Order of Dismissal as to Tenneco Inc., #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nobili v. Chevron USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Olefins LLC
Represented By: James A. L. Daniel
Represented By: Michael Brem
Represented By: Tyler Brent Gammon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corp.
Represented By: James Wilson Jennings, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Jesse Dickenson
Represented By: Jonathan Shoebotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Hampton Refining, Co.
Represented By: Robert Michael Trumble
Represented By: Landon Scott Moyer
Represented By: Craig Lawrence Sarner
Represented By: Adrien Caulder Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Oil Co.
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Represented By: Christian Farris Tucker
Represented By: Chad Mountain
Represented By: Howard Edgar Jarvis
Represented By: Eric G. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Chemical Corp.
Represented By: Melissa Gail Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental oil Co.
Represented By: Brian James Brydges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPEC Corp.
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Diane K Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont de Neumours and Co.
Represented By: Lori Dawn Thompson
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Represented By: Robert Flora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPC Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Amoco Chemical Co.
Represented By: Carl Robert Schwertz
Represented By: Thomas Richard Waskom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPC Holdings Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tennessee Gas Pipeline Co.
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Diane K Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Chemical LP
Represented By: Lori Dawn Thompson
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Represented By: Robert Flora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenneco Inc.
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Corporation of North America
Represented By: Carl Robert Schwertz
Represented By: Thomas Richard Waskom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastman Chemical Co.
Represented By: Frank Talbott, V
Represented By: Michael Robert Daglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutia, Inc.
Represented By: James Wilson Jennings, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Jesse Dickenson
Represented By: Jonathan Shoebotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oxy USA Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Gail Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Co.
Represented By: Brian James Brydges
Represented By: Bradley Rutledge
Represented By: Brett J. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Oil Corp.
Represented By: Glenn Walthall Pulley
Represented By: Amanda M. Morgan
Represented By: Christopher D. Stofko, I
Represented By: Vaughn Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips
Represented By: Brian James Brydges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Phillips Chemical Co., LLC
Represented By: Melissa Gail Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Brian James Brydges
Represented By: Stephen C. Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Corporation
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Diane K Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui and Co. USA Inc.
Represented By: Martin Andrew Conn
Represented By: Eric G. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsman Petrochemical, LLC
Represented By: Christian Farris Tucker
Represented By: Jonathan Schmalfeld
Represented By: Larry J. Chilton
Represented By: Eric G. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OxyChem
Represented By: Melissa Gail Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlake Chemical Corp.
Represented By: Glenn Walthall Pulley
Represented By: Amanda M. Morgan
Represented By: Christopher D. Stofko, I
Represented By: Vaughn Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Univar USA Inc.
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Represented By: Christian Farris Tucker
Represented By: Eric G. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citgo Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Gail Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Texas Petroleum Corp.
Represented By: James A. L. Daniel
Represented By: Michael Brem
Represented By: Tyler Brent Gammon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Richfield Company
Represented By: Carl Robert Schwertz
Represented By: Thomas Richard Waskom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco, Inc.
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Represented By: Christian Farris Tucker
Represented By: Eric G. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Oil Co.
Represented By: Carl Robert Schwertz
Represented By: Thomas Richard Waskom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxon Mobil Corp.
Represented By: Glenn Walthall Pulley
Represented By: Amanda M. Morgan
Represented By: Christopher D. Stofko, I
Represented By: Vaughn Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Co.
Represented By: John Thomas Jessee
Represented By: Paul C. Kuhnel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Oil Company of California
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Represented By: Christian Farris Tucker
Represented By: Jonathan Schmalfeld
Represented By: Larry J. Chilton
Represented By: Eric G. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA, Inc.
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Represented By: Christian Farris Tucker
Represented By: Jonathan Schmalfeld
Represented By: Larry J. Chilton
Represented By: Eric G. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Hampton Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Michael Trumble
Represented By: Landon Scott Moyer
Represented By: Craig Lawrence Sarner
Represented By: Adrien Caulder Pickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texaco Inc.
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Represented By: Christian Farris Tucker
Represented By: Jonathan Schmalfeld
Represented By: Larry J. Chilton
Represented By: Eric G. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsubishi International Corp.
Represented By: Christopher Fitzjames Quirk
Represented By: David W. Hearn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco LP
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Represented By: Christian Farris Tucker
Represented By: Chad Mountain
Represented By: Howard Edgar Jarvis
Represented By: Eric G. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: Lori Dawn Thompson
Represented By: Monique M. Weiner
Represented By: Robert Flora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco, Inc.
Represented By: Eric George Reeves
Represented By: Christian Farris Tucker
Represented By: Chad Mountain
Represented By: Howard Edgar Jarvis
Represented By: Eric G. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabic Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J. Schneider
Represented By: Ashley Presson
Represented By: Christopher Charles Ege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Tennessee Pipeline Co., LLC.
Represented By: Jeanne Elizabeth Noonan
Represented By: Diane K Bounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Co.
Represented By: James Wilson Jennings, Jr.
Represented By: Charles Jesse Dickenson
Represented By: Jonathan Shoebotham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Products North America, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Robert Schwertz
Represented By: Thomas Richard Waskom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Petrochemicals LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Philips Chemical Co, LP
Represented By: Melissa Gail Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnamarie Nobili
Represented By: Kevin Todd Hadden
Represented By: William Roberts Sievers
Represented By: Jonathan Ward
Represented By: Adam White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?