Howard v. Nashville Quality, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lillie Howard
Defendant: Carrols Corporation, Impossible Foods Inc. and Nashville Quality, LLC doing business as Burger King
Case Number: 4:2023cv00016
Filed: June 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND / Answer to Amended Complaint by Nashville Quality, LLC.(Schnetzler, Nathan)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Response re #17 Order . filed by Nashville Quality, LLC. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing LLC parties to file a statement outlining the citizenship of the LLC. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 7/19/2023. (ham)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nashville Quality, LLC identifying Corporate Parents Carrols Restaurant Group, Inc.; Tennessee Quality, LLC; CFH, LLC. (Schnetzler, Nathan) Modified on 7/19/2023 - Added all corporate parents (ham).
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #7 Amended Complaint. Nashville Quality, LLC answer due 7/21/2023. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 7/17/2023. (ham)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #7 Amended Complaint by Nashville Quality, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Bird-Johnson on behalf of Impossible Foods Inc. (Bird-Johnson, Amanda)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Impossible Foods Inc.. (Broughton, Turner)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner Anderson Broughton on behalf of Impossible Foods Inc. (Broughton, Turner)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lillie Howard. Impossible Foods Inc. served on 6/28/2023, answer due 7/19/2023; Nashville Quality, LLC served on 6/28/2023, answer due 7/19/2023.(Woodrow, William) Modified on 6/29/2023 - corrected service and answer due dates as to Nashville Quality, LLC (ham).
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Henry Schnetzler on behalf of Nashville Quality, LLC (Schnetzler, Nathan)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 6/28/20023. (ham)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT to name proper Defendant LLC against All Defendants, filed by Lillie Howard.(Woodrow, William)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Carrols Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Henry Schnetzler on behalf of Carrols Corporation (Schnetzler, Nathan)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lillie Howard. Impossible Foods Inc. served on 6/12/2023, answer due 7/3/2023.(Woodrow, William)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lillie Howard. Carrols Corporation served on 6/12/2023, answer due 7/3/2023.(Woodrow, William)
June 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Carrols Corporation and Impossible Foods Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(ham)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR NEGLIGENCE/GROSS NEGLIGENCE/WILLFUL AND WANTON NEGLIGENCE, AND BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF MERCHANTABILITY against Carrols Corporation and Impossible Foods Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $402.00; pay.gov receipt number AVAWDC-4202077) filed by Lillie Howard. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ham)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Nashville Quality, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Howard
Represented By: William T. Woodrow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrols Corporation
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impossible Foods Inc.
Represented By: Turner Anderson Broughton
Represented By: Amanda Bird-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nashville Quality, LLC doing business as Burger King
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?