Dillard v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Janice D. Dillard
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00027
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORAL ORDER STAYING CASE until May 24, 2024, due to pending settlement. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 12/13/2023. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)
November 29, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Pending Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC (Wayne, Charles) Modified on 11/30/2023 - Modified docket entry type (ham).
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Christopher S. McRae to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Christopher Scott McRae for Sanofi US Services Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 11/8/2023. (al)
November 7, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION for Christopher S. McRae to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-4298419. by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Houston, Olivia)
November 1, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Olivia Lynn Houston on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC (Houston, Olivia)
November 1, 2023 Filing 11 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Wayne, Charles) (Main Document 11 replaced on 11/1/2023) (ham). Modified on 11/1/2023 - Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document (ham).
November 1, 2023 Filing 10 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi US Services Inc. for Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. (Wayne, Charles) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/1/2023) (kld). Modified on 11/1/2023 - Replaced deficient pdf document with flattened pdf document (kld).
November 1, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles B. Wayne on behalf of Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC (Wayne, Charles)
October 30, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-15380. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to Western District of Virginia. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, DOC 16511)(my) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specific MDL Records to be included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transfer of Orders, #2 Exhibit B - PTO, #3 Exhibit C - CMO, #4 Exhibit D - Pleadings, #5 Exhibit E - Orders on Dispositive Motions, #6 Exhibit F - Daubert Orders, #7 Exhibit G - MIL Orders)(Britton, Mary) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]
January 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (blg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]
December 12, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (jeg) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]
December 7, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6519490) filed by Janice D. Dillard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney John T. Boundas added to party Janice D. Dillard(pty:pla).(Boundas, John) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/30/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillard v. Sanofi US Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Olivia Lynn Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Olivia Lynn Houston
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC
Represented By: Charles B. Wayne
Represented By: Christopher Scott McRae
Represented By: Olivia Lynn Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice D. Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?