Lipson v. Claxton et al

Plaintiff: Steven E. Lipson
Defendant: Neil Infante, Burak Baskan, John Does 1-5, EMP Media, Inc., Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc. and Shad Applegate
Case Number: 5:2012cv00051
Filed: May 3, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Harrisonburg Office
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Referring Judge: James G Welsh
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying #75 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting #83 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting #84 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #94 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 4/18/2013. (jat)
April 18, 2013 Filing 99 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Motion Hearing held on 4/18/2013 re #94 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Steven E. Lipson, #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Net Vista, Inc., #75 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Steven E. Lipson, #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ross B. Claxton. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Sonia Ferris.) (jat)
April 17, 2013 Filing 97 RESPONSE to Motion re #94 First MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc.. (Rose, Kevin)
April 15, 2013 Filing 96 Response re #85 Brief / Memorandum in Support,, #92 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition,. filed by Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rose, Kevin)
April 15, 2013 Filing 95 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #94 First MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17)(Rivera, Domingo)
April 15, 2013 Filing 94 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Steven E. Lipson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rivera, Domingo)
April 12, 2013 Filing 93 RESPONSE in Support re #75 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Rivera, Domingo)
April 8, 2013 Filing 92 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Rivera, Domingo)
April 5, 2013 Filing 91 Objections by Defendants Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc. re #75 Motion for Leave to File (Rose, Kevin)
April 2, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #75 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 02:00 PM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (kld)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants; granting Oral Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh on 3/28/2013. (jat)
March 25, 2013 Filing 88 REPLY to Response to Motion re #75 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Rivera, Domingo)
March 22, 2013 Filing 87 Response re #75 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint Attaching Proposed Amended Complaint. filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Rivera, Domingo)
March 19, 2013 Filing 86 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2013 02:00 PM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (kld)
March 19, 2013 Filing 85 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #84 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #83 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. A, #2 Exhibit Exh. B, #3 Exhibit Exh. C, #4 Exhibit Exh. D, #5 Exhibit Exh. E, #6 Exhibit Exh. F, #7 Exhibit Exh. G, #8 Exhibit Exh. H, #9 Exhibit Exh. I, #10 Exhibit Exh. J, #11 Exhibit Exh. K, #12 Exhibit Exh. L, #13 Exhibit Exh. M, #14 Exhibit Exh. N, #15 Exhibit Exh. O, #16 Exhibit Exh. P, #17 Exhibit Exh. Q, #18 Exhibit Exh. R, #19 Exhibit Exh. S)(Rose, Kevin)
March 19, 2013 Filing 84 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Net Vista, Inc.. (Rose, Kevin)
March 19, 2013 Filing 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Ross B. Claxton. (Rose, Kevin)
March 18, 2013 Filing 82 FTR Log Notes for Motion Hearing in the Harrisonburg Division held before Judge James G. Welsh on 3/18/13. In accordance with 28 USC 753(b), I certify that I monitored the digital recording of this proceeding and that it is a true and correct record, that it is sufficiently intelligible when played on the FTR (For the Record) Player (with the exception of atty appearing by telephone), and that it can be transcribed without undue difficulty. FTR Operator: Karen Dotson (kld)
March 18, 2013 Filing 81 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh: Motion Hearing held on 3/18/2013 re #74 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc. (Court Reporter Karen Dotson, FTR.) (kld)
March 15, 2013 Filing 80 Notice of Cancellation of 3/18/13 Motion Hrg on Doc #75 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Hearing will still go forward as to doc #74 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment (kld)
March 14, 2013 Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #74 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment. filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rivera, Domingo)
March 14, 2013 Filing 78 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #75 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. filed by Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rose, Kevin)
March 13, 2013 Filing 77 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing on Motion #74 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment, #75 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint :Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2013 03:30 PM in Harrisonburg before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. Plaintiff to set up the call. Once parties are joined then call the court at 540-434-3181 ext. 0.(kld)
March 8, 2013 Filing 76 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #75 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rivera, Domingo)
March 8, 2013 Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Steven E. Lipson.Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rivera, Domingo)
March 8, 2013 Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc..Motions referred to Judge James G. Welsh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Kevin)
November 16, 2012 Filing 73 ANSWER to #71 Amended Complaint by Ross B. Claxton.(Rose, Kevin)
November 16, 2012 Filing 72 ANSWER to #71 Amended Complaint by Net Vista, Inc..(Rose, Kevin)
November 9, 2012 Filing 71 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ross B. Claxton, John Does 1-5, Net Vista, Inc., filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rivera, Domingo)
October 17, 2012 Filing 70 Notice of Cancellation of status conference call on 10/8/12 (kld)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 CONSENT ORDER denying as moot #61 Motion for Leave to File; granting #12 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice; granting #13 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice; granting #16 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Failure to State a Claim; granting #18 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice for Lack of Jurisdiction; Amended Complaint deadline 11/9/2012; Lifting Partial Stay; Jury Trial set for 9:30 a.m. 5/20/2013 - 5/24/2013; Cancelling Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2012; and further such relief and deadlines as set forth in said order. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/16/2012. (jat)
October 16, 2012 Filing 68 Notice of Correction - Deleted Proposed Consent Order. Order Forwarded to Chambers. Proposed Orders should be emailed chambers in accordance with our Administrative Procedure Manual. (jat)
October 5, 2012 Filing 66 NOTICE of Hearing:Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/8/2012 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. Plaintiff counsel to set up call.(kld)
October 2, 2012 Filing 64 Objections by Defendant EMP Media, Inc. re #61 Motion for Leave to File. (LaPar, Kelly)
October 1, 2012 Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh: Telephonic Status Conference held in chambers on 10/1/2012. (kld)
October 1, 2012 Filing 63 Objections by Defendants Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc. re #61 Motion for Leave to File. (Rose, Kevin)
September 25, 2012 Filing 62 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #61 First MOTION for Leave to Supplement/File Exhibit. filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Rivera, Domingo)
September 25, 2012 Filing 61 First MOTION for Leave to Supplement/File Exhibit by Steven E. Lipson.Motions referred to James G. Welsh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rivera, Domingo)
September 19, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE of Hearing by Attorney for EMP Media, Inc. re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED to be held on October 18, 2012, at 2:30 p.m., at U.S. District Court, 116 N. Main Street, Harrisonburg, VA, before Judge Urbanski. Confirmed with U.S. Clerk's Office. (Brake, Brian)
September 19, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE of Hearing by Attorney for Shad Applegate, Burak Baskan, Neil Infante re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to be held on October 18, 2012, at 2:30 p.m., at U.S. District Court, 116 N. Main Street, Harrisonburg, VA, before Judge Urbanski. Confirmed with U.S. Clerk's Office. (Brake, Brian)
September 17, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED, #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #12 MOTION to Dismiss, #13 MOTION to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2012 02:30 PM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (jat)
September 17, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE of Hearing by Attorney for Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc. Motion Hearing to be held on October 18, 2012, at 2:30 p.m., at U.S. District Court, 116 N. Main St., Harrisonburg, VA, before Judge Urbanski. Confirmed with U.S. Clerk's Office. (Rose, Kevin)
September 14, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: Status Conference Call set for 10/1/2012 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. Atty Brake to set up call.(kld)
September 13, 2012 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh: Status Conference Call held in chambers on 9/13/2012. (kld)
September 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Laura Kathryn Marston terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh on 9/13/12. (kld)
September 12, 2012 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Steven E. Lipson.Motions referred to James G. Welsh. (Marston, Laura)
September 11, 2012 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Domingo Juan Rivera on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rivera, Domingo)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Continue hearing. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/22/12. (kld)
August 22, 2012 Filing 50 Consent MOTION to Continue August 27, 2012 Hearing by Steven E. Lipson.Motions referred to James G. Welsh. (Marston, Laura)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh on 8/17/12. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (kld)
August 7, 2012 Filing 48 MOTION for Protective Order by EMP Media, Inc..Motions referred to James G. Welsh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brake, Brian)
July 24, 2012 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Robert Lauro on behalf of Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc. (Lauro, Daniel)
July 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #28 Motion to Stay; granting in part and denying in part #30 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh on 7/23/12. (kld)
July 23, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: Status Conference Call set for 9/13/2012 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. Mr. Brake to set up and initiate the call, once all parties are joined, call the court at 540-434-3181 ext. 0.(kld)
July 23, 2012 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh: Motion Hearing held on 7/23/2012 re #28 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by EMP Media, Inc., #30 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc. (Court Reporter Tracy Koschara, Hart Reporting.) (kld)
July 20, 2012 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. filed by Shad Applegate, Burak Baskan, Neil Infante. (Brake, Brian)
July 20, 2012 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED. filed by EMP Media, Inc.. (Brake, Brian)
July 20, 2012 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss, #13 MOTION to Dismiss. filed by Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc.. (Rose, Kevin)
July 16, 2012 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Support re #28 MOTION to Stay Discovery. filed by EMP Media, Inc.. (Brake, Brian)
July 16, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura K. Marston on behalf of Steven E. Lipson. (Dozier, John) Modified on 7/23/2012 - edited text to indicate attorney whom noted appearance (ham).
July 13, 2012 Filing 38 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss, #13 MOTION to Dismiss, #14 Brief / Memorandum in Support. filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Dozier, John)
July 13, 2012 Filing 37 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #19 Brief / Memorandum in Support,. filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven E. Lipson)(Dozier, John)
July 13, 2012 Filing 36 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED. filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Dozier, John)
July 12, 2012 Filing 35 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendants Ross B. Claxton, EMP Media, Inc., Net Vista, Inc., Plaintiff Steven E. Lipson. (Dozier, John)
July 11, 2012 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION to Stay Discovery. filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Dozier, John)
July 10, 2012 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #28 MOTION to Stay Discovery. filed by Steven E. Lipson. (Dozier, John)
June 29, 2012 Filing 32 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #30 MOTION to Stay Discovery, #28 MOTION to Stay Discovery : Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2012 10:00 AM in Harrisonburg room 249 before Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. (kld)
June 27, 2012 Filing 31 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #30 MOTION to Stay Discovery. filed by Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rose, Kevin)
June 27, 2012 Filing 30 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc..Motions referred to James G. Welsh. (Rose, Kevin)
June 26, 2012 Filing 29 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #28 MOTION to Stay Discovery. filed by EMP Media, Inc.. (Brake, Brian)
June 26, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay Discovery by EMP Media, Inc..Motions referred to James G. Welsh. (Brake, Brian)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED, #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #12 MOTION to Dismiss, #13 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/13/2012. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 6/25/2012. (jat)
June 22, 2012 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss, #13 MOTION to Dismiss, #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED by Steven E. Lipson.Motions referred to James G. Welsh. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dozier, John)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Jury Trial set for 5/20/2013-5/24/2013 09:30 AM in Harrisonburg before District Judge Michael F. Urbanski), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James G. Welsh. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 6/21/12. (kld)
June 20, 2012 Filing 24 NOTICE of Hearing by Attorney for Shad Applegate, Burak Baskan, Neil Infante re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to be held on August 27, 2012, at 1:00 p.m., at U.S. District Court, Harrisonburg Division, before Judge Urbanski. Confirmed with U.S. Clerk's Office. (Brake, Brian)
June 20, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing by Attorney for EMP Media, Inc. re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED to be held on August 27, 2012, at 1:00 p.m., at U.S. District Court, Harrisonburg Division, before Judge Urbanski. Confirmed with U.S. Clerk's Office. (Brake, Brian)
June 18, 2012 Filing 22 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED ; CORRECTED VERSION. filed by EMP Media, Inc.. (Brake, Brian)
June 18, 2012 Filing 21 Scheduling Letter to counsel. (ham)
June 18, 2012 Filing 20 Magistrate Consent Notice to Counsel. (ham)
June 15, 2012 Filing 19 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. filed by Shad Applegate, Burak Baskan, Neil Infante. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Neil Infante, #2 Affidavit Shad Applegate, #3 Affidavit Burak Baskan)(Brake, Brian)
June 15, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Shad Applegate, Burak Baskan, Neil Infante. (Brake, Brian)
June 15, 2012 Filing 17 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED. filed by EMP Media, Inc.. (Brake, Brian)
June 15, 2012 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED by EMP Media, Inc.. (Brake, Brian)
June 12, 2012 Filing 15 Letter to Daniel R. Lauro, Esq. re: Attorney Admission and CM/ECF Registration. (ham)
June 12, 2012 Filing 14 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss, #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ross B. Claxton, Net Vista, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rose, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Net Vista, Inc.. (Rose, Kevin)
June 12, 2012 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Ross B. Claxton. (Rose, Kevin)
May 30, 2012 Filing 11 Notice of Correction re #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Included in Docket text that the extension applies to Ross B. Claxton & Net Vista, Inc. (jat)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Shad Applegate answer due 6/15/2012; Burak Baskan answer due 6/15/2012; EMP Media, Inc. answer due 6/15/2012; Neil Infante answer due 6/15/2012, Ross B. Claxton answer due 6/15/2012; Net Vista, Inc. answer due 6/15/2012. Signed by District Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 5/24/2012. (jat) Modified on 5/30/2012 (jat).
May 25, 2012 Filing 9 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Net Vista, Inc.. (Rose, Kevin)
May 24, 2012 Filing 8 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shad Applegate, Burak Baskan, EMP Media, Inc., Neil Infante. (Brake, Brian)
May 24, 2012 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Shad Applegate, Burak Baskan, EMP Media, Inc., Neil Infante. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brake, Brian)
May 22, 2012 Filing 6 RETURN of service of Summons and Complaint on May 11, 2012 upon Ross B. Claxton, NetData Solutions, and Net Vista, Inc., a Nevada corporation. ANSWER DUE AS TO ROSS B. CLAXTON, INDIVIDUALLY AND D/B/A NETDATA SOLUTIONS, NET VISTA, INC. ON 6/1/2012. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Dozier, John) Modified on 5/30/2012: Added Answer Due date. (mlh)
May 15, 2012 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Secretary of the Commonwealth (Attachments: #1 Service on Burak Baskan, #2 Service on Shad Applegate, #3 Service on Neil Infante; Service on EMP Media, Inc.)(jat)
May 4, 2012 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Shad Applegate, Burak Baskan, Ross B. Claxton, EMP Media, Inc., Neil Infante, Net Vista, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Netdata, #2 Burak Baskan, #3 Neil Infante, #4 EMP Media, Inc, #5 Net Vista, Inc, #6 Ross B. Claxton)(jat)
May 4, 2012 Filing 2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by the Clerk. (mab)
May 3, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350-receipt #0423-1533939.), filed by Steven E. Lipson. 100 Day Notice due by 8/13/2012 120 Day Service due by 8/31/2012 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipson v. Claxton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Infante
Represented By: Kelly Beth LaPar
Represented By: Brian Keith Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burak Baskan
Represented By: Kelly Beth LaPar
Represented By: Brian Keith Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMP Media, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Beth LaPar
Represented By: Brian Keith Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross B. Claxton
Represented By: Kevin Michael Rose
Represented By: Lindsay Cole Brubaker
Represented By: Daniel Robert Lauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Net Vista, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Michael Rose
Represented By: Lindsay Cole Brubaker
Represented By: Daniel Robert Lauro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shad Applegate
Represented By: Kelly Beth LaPar
Represented By: Brian Keith Brake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven E. Lipson
Represented By: John Wesley Dozier, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Kathryn Marston
Represented By: Domingo Juan Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?