Smith v. United States
Plaintiff: Stephanie Jo Smith
Defendant: Gwendolyn Hammer and United States
Case Number: 5:2018cv00111
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by United States. (Winn, Sara)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Stephanie Jo Smith. (Attachments: #1 Receipts and letter from Gerald Moore, #2 Requests for or Notification of Absence, #3 OSHA, #4 Report of Hazard, Unsafe Condition or Practice)(jv)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 Scheduling Letter (bw)
September 13, 2018 Filing 12 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (kld)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 Roseboro Notice re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Deadline set for 10/9/2018. (kld)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Party. United States added. Gwendolyn Hammer terminated. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 9/13/18. (kld)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Gwendolyn Hammer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Winn, Sara)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Gwendolyn Hammer. (Winn, Sara)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Party the United States of America as a Party Defendant for Gwendolyn Hammer by Gwendolyn Hammer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scope of Employment, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Winn, Sara)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Gwendolyn Hammer answer due 9/14/2018.. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 9/4/2018. (jv)
August 31, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by Gwendolyn Hammer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Winn, Sara)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 State Court Records from Rockingham/Harrisonburg General District Court (Attachments: #1 Fax to State Court from AUSA, #2 Protection Order filed in Rockingham/Harrisonburg General District Court)(jv) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/29/2018: #3 Sealed Document from State Court) (jv).
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Original Case File from Rockingham/Harrisonburg General District Court. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/29/2018. (jv)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jv)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from General District Court for Rockingham/ Harrisonburg, case number GV18006995-00., filed by Gwendolyn Hammer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Preliminary Protective Order filed by the Plaintiff in the General District Court for Rockingham/Harrisonburg, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Hammer
Represented By: Sara Bugbee Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Represented By: Sara Bugbee Winn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Jo Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?