Beltsville Land, LLC v. Conaboy
Plaintiff: Beltsville Land, LLC
Defendant: Thomas Robert Conaboy
In Re: Rebecca Coontz Conaboy
Case Number: 5:2018cv00136
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2018 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Settlement Conference held on 12/18/2018. (kld)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: In Chambers Conference Call held on 12/3/2018. (jv)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) In Chambers Conference Call re: mediation set for 12/3/2018 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Chambers to set up call and email parties dial in information.(kld)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 12/18/2018 10:00 AM in Harrisonburg before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 10/30/18. (kld)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jv)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order granting #1 Joint MOTION for Court-Ordered Mediation filed by Thomas Robert Conaboy, Beltsville Land, LLC. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe for Mediation. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/26/2018. (jv)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 Joint MOTION for Court-Ordered Mediation by Beltsville Land, LLC, Thomas Robert Conaboy. (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltsville Land, LLC v. Conaboy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Robert Conaboy
Represented By: Beth Carole Driver
Represented By: Hannah White Hutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Rebecca Coontz Conaboy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beltsville Land, LLC
Represented By: William E. Shmidheiser, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?