Turner v. Social Security Administration et al
Plaintiff: John P. Turner
Defendant: Veterans Administration and Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2018cv00148
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Correction: Changed viewing restriction of doc# 5 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties due to attaching incorrect pdf; only viewable by court personnel. Document correctly filed at doc#6 SS Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jv)
January 29, 2019 Filing 6 SS Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties; Mailed to Mr. Turner at address provided on docket sheet. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Veterans Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(jv)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 1/28/2019. (jv)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Veterans Administration, filed by John P. Turner. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. 2018 Staunton Veterans Parade, #3 Envelope)(jv)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John P. Turner. (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterans Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?