Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Equity Trustees, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Equity Trustees, LLC and Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: Dr. Benjamin S. Carson, Sr. and Alexander Title Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00008
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Dr. Benjamin S. Carson, Sr. in his capacity as the Secretary of the US Department of Housing and Urban Development - Service on the United States Attorney for the Western District of Virginia on 2/26/2019, filed by Equity Trustees, LLC, Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Kellam, Kathryn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Alexander Title Agency, Inc. on 2/21/2019, filed by Equity Trustees, LLC, Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Kellam, Kathryn)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Mail Return Receipt by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Equity Trustees, LLC. Benjamin S. Carson, Sr served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019.(Kellam, Kathryn)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Electronic Summons Issued as to Alexander Title Agency, Inc., Benjamin S. Carson, Sr, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equity Trustees, LLC (jv)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationstar Mortgage LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, Corporate Parent Mr. Cooper Group, Inc., Other Affiliate KKR Wand Investors, a Cayman Islands Corporation for Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (jv)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alexander Title Agency, Inc., Benjamin S. Carson, Sr (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3072378.), filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Equity Trustees, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1. Subordinate Mortgage, #3 Exhibit 2. Fixed Rate Home Equity Conversion Deed of Trust, #4 Exhibit 3. Fixed Rate Note Home Equity Conversion Closed End, #5 Exhibit 4. Appointment of Substitute Trustee)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Equity Trustees, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equity Trustees, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Hunter Kellam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Kathryn Hunter Kellam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Benjamin S. Carson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Title Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?