Harris v. First Advantage Background Services Corp.

Plaintiff: Nicole Lynn Harris
Defendant: First Advantage Background Services Corp.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00047
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint #1 by First Advantage Background Services Corp..(McDonald, Esther)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. First Advantage Background Services Corp. answer due 8/12/2019.. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 7/12/2019. (jv)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (jv)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by First Advantage Background Services Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDonald, Esther)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Advantage Background Services Corp. identifying Corporate Parent STG-Fairway U.S., LLC for First Advantage Background Services Corp.. (McDonald, Esther)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Esther Slater McDonald on behalf of First Advantage Background Services Corp. (McDonald, Esther)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Geoffrey H. Baskerville for Nicole Lynn Harris added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 7/1/2019. (jv) Modified on 7/1/2019 to reflect correct Attorney association(jv).
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on First Advantage Background Services Corp. on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019.(jv)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Geoffrey H. Baskerville to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3168586. by Nicole Lynn Harris. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gayle, John)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to First Advantage Background Services Corp. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Advantage Background Services Corp. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3165687.), filed by Nicole Lynn Harris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. First Advantage Background Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Advantage Background Services Corp.
Represented By: Esther Slater McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Lynn Harris
Represented By: John Cole Gayle, Jr.
Represented By: Geoffrey H. Baskerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?