J.R. v. Social Security
Plaintiff: J.R.
Defendant: Social Security
Case Number: 5:2019cv00057
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Marshal's Return of service of Summons & Complaint on 8/28/2019 upon U.S. Attorney(jv)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 Marshal's Return of service of Summons & Complaint on 9/3/2019 upon Social Security Administration(jv)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Marshal's Return of service of Summons & Complaint on 9/3/2019 upon Attorney General(jv)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 USM-285)(jv)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 SS Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If needed, forms may also be found at #www.vawd.uscourts.gov/forms.aspx. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe on 8/19/2019. (jv)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security, filed by J.R.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jv)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by J.R.. Motions referred to Judge Joel C. Hoppe. (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.R. v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.R.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?