Hurston Law Offices, PLLC v. Briggman
Appellee: David Barye Briggman
Appellant: Hurston Law Offices, PLLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00060
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Oral ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document to November 20, 2019 by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 10/21/19. (mka)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Correction: Changed viewing restriction of Document# 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief, due to attorney attaching incorrect/deficient pdf; only viewable by court personnel. Document correctly filed at document#6 . (jv)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief by Hurston Law Offices, PLLC. (Hurston, Nicholas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Briefing Notice: Appellant Brief due by 10/21/2019. Appellee Brief due by 11/25/2019. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/9/2019. (jv)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Designation of Record on Appeal; Bankruptcy Court case number 18-50121. (Rose, Ginger)
August 22, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Correction: replaced main doc in doc #1 with file stamped copy. Regenerated NEF. (kld)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court filed 8/21/19; Bankruptcy Court case number 18-50121 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Notice of Filing, #2 Order, #3 Docket Sheet)(kld) (Main Document 1 replaced on 8/22/2019) (kld).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurston Law Offices, PLLC v. Briggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: David Barye Briggman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Hurston Law Offices, PLLC
Represented By: Nicholas August Hurston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?