International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Plaintiff: International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00038
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. answer due 8/25/2020. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/14/2020. (jv)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. Answer due 8/18/2020. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 8/7/20. (kld)
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Merck & Co., Inc. for Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. answer due 8/11/2020. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 7/21/2020. (jv)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Filing Requirement to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnetzler, Nathan)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Henry Schnetzler on behalf of Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Schnetzler, Nathan)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. served on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020.(Beers, Paul)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Oral ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Jonathan K. Walters for International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C added. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 6/29/2020. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(jv)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Jonathan Walters, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3423314. by International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Christopher)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(kld)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C (Collins, Christopher)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3421926), filed by International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript of 1/11/2019 Hearing, #3 Exhibit C - Arbitrator Issued Award, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(kld)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C v. Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
Represented By: Nathan Henry Schnetzler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Chemical Workers Council of the United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 94-C
Represented By: Christopher Earl Collins
Represented By: Paul Graham Beers
Represented By: Jonathan K. Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?