Forsburg v. Wells Fargo & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Gerald Forsburg, Marisol Castro, Jorge Goytisolo, III, Luis Castro and Jenna Doctor
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo & Co.
Case Number: 5:2020cv00046
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Oral ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wells Fargo & Co. answer due 10/9/2020; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 10/9/2020. Entered by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/18/20. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mka)
September 17, 2020 Filing 25 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #19 Amended Complaint, by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Time)(Mayberry, William)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/14/2020. (jv)
September 14, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Luis Castro, Marisol Castro, Jenna Doctor, Gerald Forsburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Giles, Malissa)
September 10, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) #If this is a video conference click here for guidance re: participation via Zoom Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2020 02:00 PM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (mka)
September 10, 2020 Filing 21 PROPOSED ORDER - STIPULATION Stipulated Protective Order by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Mayberry, William) Modified on 9/11/2020 Docket text was modified to reflect this is a proposed order(jv).
September 1, 2020 Filing 20 Scheduling Letter (mka)
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gerald Forsburg, Jenna Doctor, Luis Castro, Marisol Castro. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Giles, Malissa) Modified on 9/1/2020 to remove filer: Jorge Goytisolo, III, as he is no longer a plaintiff(jv).
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gerald Forsburg (Giles, Malissa)
August 25, 2020 Filing 17 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Co. for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Mayberry, William)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo & Co. (Mayberry, William)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Wells Fargo & Co. answer due 9/18/2020; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 9/18/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 8/24/2020. (jv)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Filing Requirement to Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (kld)
August 18, 2020 Filing 13 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mayberry, William)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 Electronic Summons Reissued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Theodore O. Bartholow, III. for Gerald Forsburg added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 7/31/2020. (jv)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons for Wells Fargo Bank NA (corrected) by Gerald Forsburg (Giles, Malissa)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Oliver Max Gardner for Gerald Forsburg added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 7/31/2020. (jv)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Karen L. Kellett for Gerald Forsburg added. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 7/31/2020. (jv)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for O. Max Gardner, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3449207. by Gerald Forsburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Giles, Malissa)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Karen L. Kellett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3449201. by Gerald Forsburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Giles, Malissa)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Theodore O. Bartholow, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3449197. by Gerald Forsburg. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Giles, Malissa)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Wells Fargo & Co. and Wells Fargo Bank, NA by Gerald Forsburg (Giles, Malissa)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND APPLICATION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Wells Fargo & Co., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400, receipt number 0423-3444420.), filed by Gerald Forsburg. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forsburg v. Wells Fargo & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William Carter Mayberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Co.
Represented By: William Carter Mayberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Forsburg
Represented By: Malissa Lambert Giles
Represented By: Oliver Max Gardner
Represented By: Karen Lynn Kellett
Represented By: Theodore Ohmstede Bartholow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Castro
Represented By: Malissa Lambert Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Goytisolo, III
Represented By: Malissa Lambert Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Castro
Represented By: Malissa Lambert Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Doctor
Represented By: Malissa Lambert Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?