Adams v. Rockingham County
Plaintiff: Ashley Adams
Defendant: Rockingham County
Case Number: 5:2021cv00006
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) against All Defendants, filed by Ashley Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Dekker, Joanne)
March 12, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Cancellation of 3/16/2021 hearing on Motion #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (No Interpreter requested) (Cancel Court Reporter) (ck)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; Plaintiff's Response in Opposition [ECF No. 9], which the Court construes as a motion to amend, is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 3/12/2021. (jv)
March 12, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 3/12/2021. (jv)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2021 02:00 PM via Zoom before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. Zoom instructions emailed to counsel.(ck)
March 1, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Rockingham County. (Fessier, Rosalie)
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #8 Brief / Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss. filed by Ashley Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Text of Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Dekker, Joanne)
February 22, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Ashley Adams. (Dekker, Joanne)
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Rockingham County. (Fessier, Rosalie)
February 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rockingham County. (Fessier, Rosalie)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Oral ORDER: This matter was removed from Rockingham County Circuit Court on January 21, 2021 ECF No. #1 . This court requested the state court records, which were docketed on January 27, 2021. ECF No. #4 Defendant's "Answer" constitutes a "demurrer" and a "special plea in bar," which are procedural mechanisms that are unavailable in federal court. It is therefore ORDERED that (1) the clerk shall STRIKE Defendants "Answer" ECF No. #4 -2, and (2) Defendant must file an appropriate responsive pleading under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 within seven (7) days of this order. Entered by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 2/1/21. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(kld)
January 27, 2021 Filing 5 *STRICKEN* as ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal)/ Demurrer and Special Plea in Bar - located at Docket Entry #4 State Court Record Attachment #2 by Rockingham County. (jv) Modified on 2/1/2021 as per order at doc 6 (kld).
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 Paper State Court Records received from Rockingham County Circuit Court, CL20-4622, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (Attachments: #1 State Court complaint, ccs, #2 STRICKEN AS AN ANSWER - Defendant's Demurrer and Special Plea in Bar, #3 WDVA Order)(jv) Modified exhibit 2 on 2/1/2021 as per order at doc 6 (kld).
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Rockingham County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 1/21/2021. (Order mailed to Rockingham County Circuit Court via US Mail)(jv)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockingham County Circuit Court, case number CL20-4622. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402, receipt number AVAWDC-3605770), filed by Rockingham County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. State Court pleadings)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Rockingham County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Adams
Represented By: Joanne Dekker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockingham County
Represented By: Brittany Elizabeth Shipley
Represented By: Mandi Jo Montgomery Smith
Represented By: Rosalie Pemberton Fessier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?