Snell v. Wright, et al.
Plaintiff: Adrian Snell
Defendant: Tonia Wright, Volunteer Express, Inc. and Central Freight Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2021cv00025
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Referring Judge: Joel C Hoppe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Telephonic Hearing: (N) Status Conference Call set for 8/18/2021 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Dial in information emailed to counsel.(kld)
May 14, 2021 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe: Scheduling Conference Call held in chambers on 5/14/2021. (kld)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Status Conference set for 5/27/2022 09:00 AM before Judge Thomas T. Cullen., Jury Trial set for 9/26/2022 - 9/30/2022 09:30 AM in Harrisonburg before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joel C. Hoppe. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 4/29/2021. (jv)
April 15, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by Central Freight Lines, Inc., Volunteer Express, Inc., Tonia Wright.(Feehan, Alison)
April 5, 2021 Filing 18 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Volunteer Express, Inc. (Feehan, Alison)
April 5, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Filing Requirement to Volunteer Express, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)
April 1, 2021 Filing 16 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)
April 1, 2021 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00023. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Court HEREBY ORDERS that this case is TRANSFERRED to the UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF VIRGINIA, HARRISONBURG DIVISION. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/1/2021. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
April 1, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the Western District of Virginia. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
March 31, 2021 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (Court Reporter Harding, OCR): Motion Hearing held on 3/31/2021 re #3 Motion to Dismiss or Alternatively to Transfer filed by defendants Tonia Wright and Central Freight Lines, Inc. Argument heard. Motion to Transfer granted; case to be transferred to the Western District of Virginia. Memorandum Order to enter. (rpiz) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
March 26, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Joinder by Volunteer Express, Inc.. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1). (Feehan, Alison). Modified docket entry on 03/30/2021. (walk, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that this matter is before the Court on the parties' Joint Motion to Continue Hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer, which is currently scheduled for March 18, 2021 (ECF No. #10 ). It appearing good cause is shown, the Motion is GRANTED. The hearing in this matter is CONTINUED to March 31, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 03/18/2021. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
March 18, 2021 Set/Reset Hearings as to #3 Motion to Dismiss or in Alternative to Transfer: Motion Hearing reset for 3/31/2021 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Continue Hearing by Central Freight Lines, Inc., Tonia Wright. (Feehan, Alison) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
March 8, 2021 Set Hearings as to #3 Motion to Dismiss or in Alternative to Transfer: Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 7000 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Compliance by Adrian Snell. Volunteer Express, Inc. served on 03/05/2021, Answer due 03/26/2021. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 Reply to #7 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Transfer Venue filed by Central Freight Lines, Inc., Tonia Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Feehan, Alison) Modified to correct docket text on 2/9/2021 (smej, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or in Alternative Transfer filed by Adrian Snell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Speer, Eric) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
January 24, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Volunteer Express, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for the Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon the Defendant. Please ask your process server to return the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
January 22, 2021 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Service on Volunteer Express, Inc. by Adrian Snell. (Speer, Eric) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
January 21, 2021 Notice of Correction re: Documents #3 & #4 ; the filing user is requested to only include the /s/ signature line with all documents filed electronically. The filing user should not include an original signature. (walk, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or in Alternative Transfer filed by Central Freight Lines, Inc., Tonia Wright. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Feehan, Alison) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 Joint MOTION to Dismiss or in Alternative Transfer by Central Freight Lines, Inc., Tonia Wright. (Feehan, Alison) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Central Freight Lines, Inc.. (Feehan, Alison) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
January 13, 2021 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (tjoh, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Chesterfield County Circuit Court ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0422-7579472.), filed by Volunteer Express. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Tonia Wright, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of James Mahoney, #3 Exhibit Documents served on Tonia Wright, #4 Exhibit Documents served on Central Freight Line, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Feehan, Alison) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/13/2021: #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (tjoh, ). [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/1/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snell v. Wright, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonia Wright
Represented By: Alison Feehan
Represented By: Charles Stephen Setliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volunteer Express, Inc.
Represented By: Alison Feehan
Represented By: Charles Stephen Setliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Freight Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Alison Feehan
Represented By: Charles Stephen Setliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Snell
Represented By: Elizabeth Eleanor West
Represented By: Eric Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?