Widner v. HSV Holiday LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Widner
Defendant: Ugly Duckling Recreation Group Inc. and HSV Holiday LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv00043
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. It is further ordered that the hearing currently set for August 25, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. in CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 7/26/2021. (ck)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 7/26/2021. (ck)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing previously set for 8/5/2021 via Zoom on Motion #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Motion Hearing now set for 8/25/2021 11:00 AM in Harrisonburg (Courtroom 1) before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. (ck)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2021 09:30 AM via Zoom before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. Zoom instructions emailed to counsel.(ck)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by HSV Holiday LLC, Ugly Duckling Recreation Group Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exihbit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Baugher, Andrew)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #5 Brief / Memorandum in Support, #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Michelle Widner. (McClanahan, Dirk)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Paper State Court Records received from Rockingham County Circuit Court, CL21-1115, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (Attachments: #1 State Court complaint, ccs, service paperwork, nor, USDC order)(jv)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Rockingham County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 6/7/2021. (Order mailed to Rockingham County Circuit Court via US Mail)(jv)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by HSV Holiday LLC, Ugly Duckling Recreation Group Inc..(Baugher, Andrew)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by HSV Holiday LLC, Ugly Duckling Recreation Group Inc.. (Baugher, Andrew)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by HSV Holiday LLC, Ugly Duckling Recreation Group Inc.. (Baugher, Andrew)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSV Holiday LLC, Ugly Duckling Recreation Group Inc. (jv)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockingham County Circuit Court, case number CL21-1115. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402, receipt number AVAWDC-3716551), filed by Ugly Duckling Recreation Group Inc., HSV Holiday LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 1 - State Court Complaint, #3 2 - Certificate of Compliance)(jv)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Dirk McClanahan, in accordance with Section B.9. of the Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing and Verifying Pleadings and Papers by Electronic Means, a registered user is responsible for ensuring their mailing address, primary email address, and telephone number are kept up-to-date with this court by updating the information in their PACER account. To update your information, log into PACER.gov and click the Maintenance tab to Update this information with this court. (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Widner v. HSV Holiday LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ugly Duckling Recreation Group Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S. Baugher
Represented By: Cathleen P. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSV Holiday LLC
Represented By: Andrew S. Baugher
Represented By: Cathleen P. Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Widner
Represented By: Dirk Harris McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?