Larson v. True Select LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joyce Larson
Defendant: True Select LLC doing business as Firstlight Home Care, Guardianlight of Northwestern VA Incorporated doing business as Firstlight Home Care and Kendra Ghanbari
Case Number: 5:2021cv00077
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 12 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guardianlight of Northwestern VA Incorporated (Ray, Steven)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by True Select LLC (Ray, Steven)
November 18, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven William Ray on behalf of Kendra Ghanbari, Guardianlight of Northwestern VA Incorporated, True Select LLC (Ray, Steven)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joyce Larson. Kendra Ghanbari waiver sent on 11/6/2021, answer due 1/5/2022.(Goodley, James)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joyce Larson. Guardianlight of Northwestern VA Incorporated waiver sent on 11/6/2021, answer due 1/5/2022.(Goodley, James)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joyce Larson. True Select LLC waiver sent on 11/6/2021, answer due 1/5/2022.(Goodley, James)
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Kendra Ghanbari, Guardianlight of Northwestern VA Incorporated, True Select LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
November 8, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Kendra Ghanbari by Joyce Larson (Goodley, James)
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for GuardianLight of Northwestern VA Incorporated by Joyce Larson (Goodley, James)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for True Select LLC by Joyce Larson (Goodley, James)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against Kendra Ghanbari, Guardianlight of Northwestern VA Incorporated, True Select LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402, receipt number AVAWDC-3824231.), filed by Joyce Larson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(jv) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/4/2021: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. True Select LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Larson
Represented By: James Edward Goodley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Select LLC doing business as Firstlight Home Care
Represented By: Steven William Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardianlight of Northwestern VA Incorporated doing business as Firstlight Home Care
Represented By: Steven William Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendra Ghanbari
Represented By: Steven William Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?