Swartzendruber v. Sentara RMH Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Michael J. Swartzendruber
Defendant: Sentara RMH Medical Center, RMH Medical Group, LLC, United Healthcare Insurance Company and United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv00055
Filed: September 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings)( Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2023 09:00 AM in via Zoom before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski.), NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : (CR) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings)( Motion Hearing set for 2/17/2023 09:00 AM in via Zoom before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski.) (mka)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Scheduling Letter (mka)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Michael J. Swartzendruber. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Domonoske, Thomas)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Michael J. Swartzendruber. (Domonoske, Thomas)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Merker on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc. (Merker, Ryan)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Flynn on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc. (Flynn, Christopher)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 MOTION for Ryan Merker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 11/6/2022. (jv)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 MOTION for Christopher Flynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 11/6/2022. (jv)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Ryan Merker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-4067070. by United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Merker)(Rosenberg, Rochelle-Leigh)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Christopher Flynn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AVAWDC-4067026. by United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Flynn)(Rosenberg, Rochelle-Leigh)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by RMH Medical Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sentara Healthcare, Corporate Parent Sentara Hospitals for RMH Medical Group, LLC. (Willett, Henry)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sentara RMH Medical Center identifying Corporate Parent Sentara Healthcare, Corporate Parent Sentara Hospitals for Sentara RMH Medical Center. (Willett, Henry)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by RMH Medical Group, LLC, Sentara RMH Medical Center. (Willett, Henry)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by RMH Medical Group, LLC, Sentara RMH Medical Center. (Willett, Henry)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Corporate Parent United HealthCare Services, Inc., Corporate Parent UHIC Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company for United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc.. (Rosenberg, Rochelle-Leigh)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Corporate Parent United HealthCare Services, Inc., Corporate Parent UHIC Holdings, Inc. for United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Rosenberg, Rochelle-Leigh)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Declaration re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Declaration of Rochelle-Leigh Rosenberg) by United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Rosenberg, Rochelle-Leigh)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Declaration re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Declaration of Mabel S. Fairley/Legal Services Specialist UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company) by United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc. (Rosenberg, Rochelle-Leigh)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc.. (Rosenberg, Rochelle-Leigh)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (jv)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Filing Requirement to United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Notice of Filing Requirement to RMH Medical Group, LLC, Sentara RMH Medical Center - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Rochelle-Leigh Joy Rosenberg on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc. (Rosenberg, Rochelle-Leigh)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Belinda Duke Jones on behalf of RMH Medical Group, LLC, Sentara RMH Medical Center (Jones, Belinda)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Henry Irving Willett, III on behalf of RMH Medical Group, LLC, Sentara RMH Medical Center (Willett, Henry)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Henry Irving Willett, III, Esq. & Belinda Duke Jones, Esq., in accordance with Section B.9. of the Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing and Verifying Pleadings and Papers by Electronic Means, a registered user is responsible for ensuring their mailing address, primary email address, and telephone number are kept up-to-date with this court by #updating the information in their PACER account. To update your information, log into PACER.gov and click the Maintenance tab to Update this information with this court. (jv)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael J. Swartzendruber. United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc. served on 10/18/2022, answer due 11/8/2022.(Domonoske, Thomas)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael J. Swartzendruber. RMH Medical Group, LLC served on 10/12/2022, answer due 11/2/2022.(Domonoske, Thomas)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael J. Swartzendruber. Sentara RMH Medical Center served on 10/12/2022, answer due 11/2/2022.(Domonoske, Thomas)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael J. Swartzendruber. United Healthcare Insurance Company served on 10/12/2022, answer due 11/2/2022.(Domonoske, Thomas)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS by Michael J. Swartzendruber. Amendment to #1 Complaint, Summons in a Civil Action - United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc. (Domonoske, Thomas) Modified on 10/11/2022 Docket text was modified to reflect the correct docket entry(jv).
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Exhibit A to Document 1- Complaint (Bureau of Insurance Response) by Michael J. Swartzendruber. (Domonoske, Thomas)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to RMH Medical Group, LLC, Sentara RMH Medical Center, United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4.(jv)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Thomas D. Domonoske, Esq., in accordance with Section B.9. of the Administrative Procedures for Filing, Signing and Verifying Pleadings and Papers by Electronic Means, a registered user is responsible for ensuring their mailing address, primary email address, and telephone number are kept up-to-date with this court by #updating the information in their PACER account. To update your information, log into PACER.gov and click the Maintenance tab to Update this information with this court. (jv)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against RMH Medical Group, LLC, Sentara RMH Medical Center, United Healthcare Insurance Company, United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-4043178.), filed by Michael J. Swartzendruber. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swartzendruber v. Sentara RMH Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Swartzendruber
Represented By: Thomas Dean Domonoske
Represented By: Timothy Earl Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentara RMH Medical Center
Represented By: Belinda Duke Jones
Represented By: Henry Irving Willett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RMH Medical Group, LLC
Represented By: Belinda Duke Jones
Represented By: Henry Irving Willett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Rochelle-Leigh Joy Rosenberg
Represented By: Christopher Flynn
Represented By: Ryan Merker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare of the Mid-Atlantic, Inc.
Represented By: Rochelle-Leigh Joy Rosenberg
Represented By: Christopher Flynn
Represented By: Ryan Merker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?