Liberty University, Inc. et al v. Geithner et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Pausanias Alexander, Mary T. Bendorf, Delegate Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Joanne V. Merrill, Martha A. Neal, David Stein and Michele G. Waddell
Defendant: Timothy Geithner, Eric Holder, Kathleen Sebelius and Hilda L. Solis
Case Number: 6:2010cv00015
Filed: March 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Lynchburg Office
Presiding Judge: Norman K. Moon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2010 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Civil Action 6:10-cv-00015-nkm served on Eric Holder on 04/15/2010, filed by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander. Eric Holder served on 4/15/2010, answer due 6/14/2010.
April 22, 2010 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Civil Action 6:10-cv-00015-nkm served on Hilda L. Solis on 04/15/2010, filed by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander. Hilda L. Solis served on 4/15/2010, answer due 6/14/2010.
April 22, 2010 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Civil Action 6:10-cv-00015-nkm served on Kathleen Sebellius on 04/15/2010, filed by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein. Kathleen Sebelius served on 4/15/2010, answer due 6/14/2010.
April 22, 2010 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in Civil Action 6:10-cv-00015-nkm served on Timothy Geithner on April 15, 2010, filed by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander. Timothy Geithner served on 4/15/2010, answer due 6/14/2010.
April 15, 2010 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Timothy Geithner, Kathleen Sebelius, Hilda L. Solis, Eric Holder. (Amended Complaint)
April 14, 2010 Filing 11 Proposed Summons by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander as toEric Holder.
April 14, 2010 Filing 10 Proposed Summons by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander as toHilda L. Solis.
April 14, 2010 Filing 9 Proposed Summons by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander as toKathleen Sebelius.
April 14, 2010 Filing 8 Proposed Summons by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander as toTimothy Geithner.
April 14, 2010 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against Timothy Geithner, Kathleen Sebelius, Hilda L. Solis, Eric Holder, filed by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander.
March 26, 2010 Filing 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander.
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 3 MOTION for Anita L. Staver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on March 24, 2010.
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 2 MOTION for Mathew D. Staver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on March 24, 2010.
March 23, 2010 Filing 3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anita L. Staver by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jcf)
March 23, 2010 Filing 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mathew D. Staver by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jcf)
March 23, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timothy Geithner, Kathleen Sebelius, Hilda L. Solis, Eric Holder (Filing fee $ 350.oo Receipt #04230000000001082959), filed by Mary T. Bendorf, Joanne V. Merrill, Kathy Byron, Jeff Helgeson, Liberty University, Inc., Martha A. Neal, Michele G. Waddell, David Stein, Pausanias Alexander. 100 Day Notice due by 7/2/2010 120 Day Service due by 7/22/2010 (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty University, Inc. et al v. Geithner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pausanias Alexander
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary T. Bendorf
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delegate Kathy Byron
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Helgeson
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty University, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne V. Merrill
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha A. Neal
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Stein
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele G. Waddell
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Geithner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda L. Solis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?