Supinger v. Commonwealth Of Virginia et al
Case Number: 6:2015cv00017
Filed: July 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Office: Lynchburg Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Ballou
Presiding Judge: Norman K. Moon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 246 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on April 2, 2019. (sfc)
March 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 245 This matter is before the Court upon Plaintiff's motions for attorneys fees and costs (dkts. 211, 213), the Report and Recommendation of U.S. Magistrate Judge Robert Ballou (dkt. 236), and both parties' objections thereto (Dkts. 240, 241). For the reasons explained in the forthcoming memorandum opinion, the Court hereby OVERRULES Plaintiff's Objections at 241 , SUSTAINS IN PART and OVERRULES IN PART Defendant's objections, (dkt. 240), ORDER ADOPTING AS MODIFIED REPORT AND RE COMMENDATION 236 ; granting 211 Motion for Attorney Fees and granting 213 Motion for Bill of Costs awarding Plaintiff fees and costs in the amount specified in the forthcoming memorandum opinion. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on March 31, 2019. (sfc)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on April 26, 2017. (ca)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on July 20, 2016. (sfc)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: adopting 126 Report and Recommendation; and granting in part and denying in part 91 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Specifically, Plaintiff's motion to amend his complaint as to his Title VII sex discrimination, the Title VII retaliation, and the claim for a violation of Va. Code § 40.1-51.2:1 is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion to amend his complaint as to his First Amendment retaliation claim is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on June 21, 2016. (sfc)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on March 2, 2016. (sfc)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Norman K. Moon on December 1, 2015. (sfc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Supinger v. Commonwealth Of Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?