Satterwhite et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Wesley Satterwhite and Barbara Satterwhite
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 6:2019cv00061
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr. terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on October 1, 2019. (sfc)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines. Discovery and all pretrial deadlines are hereby STAYED until November 15, 2019. The parties are further DIRECTED to submit a status report to the Court no later than November 22, 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on September 30, 2019. (sfc)
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and all Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Busman, Philip)
September 25, 2019 Filing 20 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent C.R. Bard, Inc. for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated; Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson & Company for C R Bard Incorporated. (Busman, Philip)
September 19, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard B. North by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Busman, Philip)
September 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Marshall Busman on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Busman, Philip)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER directing parties to submit a Proposed Pretrial Order, due by 10/9/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/19/19. (Attachments: #1 Judge Moon Standard Pretrial Order)(mka)
September 12, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Submission from MDL Case (sfc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 Motions in Limine Orders from MDL Case (sfc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 14 Miscellaneous Orders from MDL Case (sfc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 13 Master and Short - Form Pleadings from MDL Case(sfc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 Discovery Orders from MDL Case (sfc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 Discovery and Privilege Orders from MDL Case(sfc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 Deposition Designation Orders from MDL Case (sfc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Daubert Orders from MDL Case (sfc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 Case Management Orders from MDL Case (sfc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 MDL Case Docket Sheet (sfc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:16-cv-00679. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 12, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Western District of Virginia via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED Re: #4 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19.(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Document for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 11, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(LSP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 11, 2016 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-16-679-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 11, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12724839 filed by Barbara Satterwhite, Wesley Satterwhite. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Satterwhite et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Satterwhite
Represented By: Jeff Thomas Seldomridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Satterwhite
Represented By: Jeff Thomas Seldomridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?