Tolley v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Travis T. Tolley
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00064
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Travis T. Tolley's Reply re #10 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(sfc)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 Paper State Court Records received from Bedford General District Court, GV19001948, consisting of 1 Envelope, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (al)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition (Entitled Counterclaim) re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Travis T. Tolley. (al)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER (CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou as set forth herein). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/24/2019. (al)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Roseboro Notice to Travis T. Tolley re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Deadline set for 10/17/2019. (al)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Jones, Maryia)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Maryia Yrjeuna Jones on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Jones, Maryia)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Bedford General District Court. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 9/16/2019. (al)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (ca)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Bedford County General District Court, Case Number GV19001948 (Filing & Administrative fee $400.00, Receipt No. 0423-3225663), filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Warrant in Debt, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tolley v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Maryia Yrjeuna Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis T. Tolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?