Diggs v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Sam Jerome Diggs
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 6:2019cv00072
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1Electronic Summons Issued to U.S. Attorney General, #2 Electronic Summons Issued to U.S. Attorney)(al)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons by Sam Jerome Diggs as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Palmer, Melissa)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Melissa A. Palmer for Sam Jerome Diggs added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on October 29, 2019. (sfc)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Melissa A. Palmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0423-3255352. by Sam Jerome Diggs. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goss, John)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 SS Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (al)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If needed, forms may also be found at #www.vawd.uscourts.gov/forms.aspx. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 10/22/2019. (al)
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Sam Jerome Diggs. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ca)
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sam Jerome Diggs. (ca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diggs v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Jerome Diggs
Represented By: John Osborne Goss
Represented By: Melissa A. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?