McIntyre v. P.A.M. Transport, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rachel McIntyre
Defendant: P.A.M. Transport, Inc., Jose Amilcar Carcamo, Caleb Andrew Littlepage and Dependable Enterprises Corporation
Case Number: 6:2020cv00009
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Norman K Moon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File A Third-Party Complaint by Dependable Enterprises Corporation. It is further ORDERED that said Defendant shall electronically file its Third-Party Complaint against the entity named in its Motion by May 15, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on May 8, 2020. (ca)
April 27, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File A Third Party Complaint by Dependable Enterprises Corporation. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED ANSWER to the Complaint of Plaintiff Rachel McIntyre by Jose Amilcar Carcamo, Dependable Enterprises Corporation. (Cox, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Amend/Correct Answer to Complaint. It is further ORDERED that the said Defendants shall electronically file their Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 4/20/2020. (al)
April 16, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 7 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Jose Amilcar Carcamo, Dependable Enterprises Corporation. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Jeffrey)
April 10, 2020 Filing 13 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendant P.A.M. Transport, Inc. (Frankl, Daniel)
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) (No Interpreter requested) Jury Trial set for April 29 - 30, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Lynchburg before Senior Judge Norman K. Moon. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ca)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney John Timothy Husk for Dependable Enterprises Corporation and Jose Amilcar Carcamo. Attorney James Rhea Jebo is hereby withdrawn as counsel for Dependable Enterprises Corporation and Jose Amilcar Carcamo in this matter and discharged from any further role in this lawsuit as of the date of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 4/8/2020. (al)
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Jose Amilcar Carcamo, Dependable Enterprises Corporation. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Jeffrey)
April 3, 2020 Filing 9 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rachel McIntyre (Dooley, Timothy)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER, (CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou as set forth herein). Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/25/2020. (al)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - located at Docket Entry #5 State Court Record at page #19 by Jose Amilcar Carcamo and Dependable Enterprises Corporation. (al)
March 23, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - located at Docket Entry #5 State Court Record at page# 24 by Caleb Andrew Littlepage and P.A.M. Transport, Inc. (al)
March 23, 2020 Filing 5 Paper State Court Records received from Rockbridge County Circuit Court, CL20000079-00, consisting of 1 Folder, (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (al) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/23/2020 to include filed stamp) (al). Modified on 3/23/2020 (al).
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by P.A.M. Transport, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent P.A.M. Transportation Services, Inc. for P.A.M. Transport, Inc.. (Frankl, Daniel)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Rockbridge County Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Norman K. Moon on 3/13/2020. (al)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dependable Enterprises Corporation. (al)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Rockbridge County Circuit Court, case number CL20000079-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0423-3352409), filed by Dependable Enterprises Corporation and Jose Amilcar Carcamo. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint - Rockbridge County Circuit Court, #2 Answer - Rockbridge County Circuit Court, #3 Notice of Filing Removal - Rockbridge County Circuit Court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(al)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIntyre v. P.A.M. Transport, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel McIntyre
Represented By: Timothy David Dooley
Represented By: Charles Benjamin Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A.M. Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Frankl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Amilcar Carcamo
Represented By: James Rhea Jebo
Represented By: John Timothy Husk
Represented By: Jeffrey Ellison Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Andrew Littlepage
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Frankl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dependable Enterprises Corporation
Represented By: James Rhea Jebo
Represented By: John Timothy Husk
Represented By: Jeffrey Ellison Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?